United States of America v. $3,864.00 in U.S. Currency

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $3,864.00 in U.S. Currency and $3,864.00 in U.S. Currency
Case Number: 1:2019cv00153
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:0881
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Set Deadlines re: #4 Declaration of Publication: Verified Claims to be filed on or before 7/15/2019. (maf)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date June 12, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Declaration of Publication))(Letzring, Jonathan)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 USMS Return of Service for Warrant for Arrest in Rem. $3864.00 in US Currency closed out of JDIS on 5/13/2019. (kby)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 WARRANT Issued for Arrest in Rem. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns on 5/13/2019. (maf)
May 13, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (maf)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem (Verified) against Approximately $3,864.00 in U.S. Currency, filed by United States of America.(Letzring, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $3,864.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $3,864.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $3,864.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jonathan D. Letzring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?