Smiley v. Saul
Plaintiff: Melissa Dawn Smiley
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv00163
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Referring Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Andrew Saul served on 6/7/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (maf)
June 25, 2019 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE FROM THE CLERK: On June 4, 2019, Andrew Saul was confirmed as the new Commissioner of Social Security. Accordingly, pursuant to Rule 25(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Andrew Saul is hereby substituted for Nancy A. Berryhill as the Defendant in this action. The Clerk has updated the docket accordingly. (maf)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically to US Marshal for service as to Nancy A. Berryhill, US Attorney, and US Attorney General. (ni) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/3/2019: #1 USM 285s) (ni).
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Clerk of Court is instructed to issue summons and provide summons to USMS for service upon Defendant. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 06/03/2019. (ni)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY Order of Referral - Social Security. Pursuant to the Standing Order 3:13MC95, 28 U.S.C. 636(b) and Local Civil Rule 72.1 this case is referred to a United States Magistrate Judge to make findings of fact, conclusions of law and to recommend disposition of any dispositive motion filed through submission of a Memorandum and Recommendation to the District Judge. Case referred to Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Entered by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 6/3/2019. (ams)Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
May 24, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (ejb)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Melissa Dawn Smiley. (Lopez, Robert)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill, filed by Melissa Dawn Smiley.(Lopez, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smiley v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Dawn Smiley
Represented By: Robert Joseph Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?