Trans Solutions - Asheville, LLC v. Hartt Transportation Systems, Inc.

Plaintiff: Trans Solutions - Asheville, LLC
Defendant: Hartt Transportation Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00200
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Trans Solutions - Asheville, LLC (Jones, W.)
August 13, 2019 Mediator W. O. Brazil, III advised case settled, pursuant to filing of #15 Report of Mediation. Agreement for entry of judgment or a stipulation of dismissal to be filed within 30 days or the court will dismiss the case without prejudice. Case Settlement Deadline 9/12/2019. (ejb)
August 12, 2019 Filing 15 REPORT of Mediation. Outcome of Mediation: Completely Settled. (Brazil, Wilburn)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting Pltf's #13 Motion for Extension of Time Amend Complaint, and the deadline Pltf may file an Amended Complaint is extended up to and including 8/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 7/26/2019. (ejb)
July 24, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint by Trans Solutions - Asheville, LLC. Responses due by 8/7/2019 (Searson, W.). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Text of Order: The parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. 11) is GRANTED. Plaintiff has up to and including August 15, 2019 to file its response to Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 07/19/2019. (APM)
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trans Solutions - Asheville, LLC (Jones, W.)
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Partial Motion to Dismiss by Trans Solutions - Asheville, LLC. Responses due by 7/31/2019 (Searson, W.). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Hartt Transportation Systems, Inc..(Langford, Michael)
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Partial Motion to Dismiss by Hartt Transportation Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael B. Langford)(Langford, Michael) Modified text on 7/11/2019 (ejb).
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Partial Motion to Dismiss by Hartt Transportation Systems, Inc.. Responses due by 7/24/2019 (Langford, Michael). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf. Modified text on 7/11/2019. NEF Regenerated. (ejb)
June 28, 2019 Notice to Attorney Michael B.Langford: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 7/5/2019. (ejb)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Michael B. Langford for Hartt Transportation Systems, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 6/28/2019. (ejb)
June 28, 2019 Notice to Attorney James A. Eckhart: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 7/5/2019. (ejb)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added James A. Eckhart for Hartt Transportation Systems, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 6/28/2019. (ejb)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to James A. Eckhart Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4076695. by Hartt Transportation Systems, Inc.. (Hornthal, Ann-Patton). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Michael B. Langford Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4076679. by Hartt Transportation Systems, Inc.. (Hornthal, Ann-Patton). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
June 21, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (ejb)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Wyatt S. Stevens on behalf of Hartt Transportation Systems, Inc. (Stevens, Wyatt)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hartt Transportation Systems, Inc. (Hornthal, Ann-Patton)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Buncombe County Superior Court, case number 19-cvs-2639. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4070226), filed by Hartt Transportation Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pl.'s Verified Complaint, #2 Exhibit Pl.'s Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #3 Exhibit Civil Summons, #4 Exhibit June 19, 2019 Letter, #5 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal to Federal Court)(Hornthal, Ann-Patton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trans Solutions - Asheville, LLC v. Hartt Transportation Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trans Solutions - Asheville, LLC
Represented By: W. Scott Jones
Represented By: W. Bradford Searson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartt Transportation Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Ann-Patton Hornthal
Represented By: Wyatt S. Stevens
Represented By: Michael B. Langford
Represented By: James A. Eckhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?