Crawford v. Blue Ridge Metals Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Wesley Crawford
Defendant: Keith Ramsey, Jennifer Kirkpatrick, Blue Ridge Metals Corporation and Donald Young
Case Number: 1:2019cv00206
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Referring Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Shults, Glen)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time Text of Order: The parties' Joint Motion to Extend the Deadline for the Initial Attorney's Conference and Filing the Certificate of Initial Attorney's Conference (Doc. 7) is GRANTED. The deadline for the Initial Attorney's Conference is July 31, 2019, and the deadline for filing the certificate of initial attorney's conference is August 7, 2019. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 07/18/2019. (APM)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Conducting the Initial Attorneys' Conference and Filing the Certificate of Initial Attorneys' Conference by Wesley Crawford. Responses due by 7/31/2019 (Shults, Glen). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
June 28, 2019 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 7/19/2019. (maf)
June 27, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (maf)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jennifer Kirkpatrick (Yarbrough, Jonathan)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Keith Ramsey (Yarbrough, Jonathan)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Donald Young (Yarbrough, Jonathan)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Blue Ridge Metals Corporation (Yarbrough, Jonathan)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal, by Blue Ridge Metals Corporation, Jennifer Kirkpatrick, Keith Ramsey, Donald Young.(Yarbrough, Jonathan)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Buncombe County Superior, case number 18CV04550. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4076828), filed by Jennifer Kirkpatrick, Blue Ridge Metals Corporation, Keith Ramsey, Donald Young. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Complaint, #2 Ex. B - Summonses - dated 10.9.18, #3 Ex. C - Summonses - dated 1.3.19, #4 Ex. D - First Amended Complaint, #5 Ex. E - Summonses - dated 4.2.19)(Yarbrough, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crawford v. Blue Ridge Metals Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Crawford
Represented By: Glen C. Shults
Represented By: Jack Wiley Westall, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Ramsey
Represented By: Jonathan W. Yarbrough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Kirkpatrick
Represented By: Jonathan W. Yarbrough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Ridge Metals Corporation
Represented By: Jonathan W. Yarbrough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Young
Represented By: Jonathan W. Yarbrough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?