Faria v. Wright et al
Plaintiff: Saymon Faria
Defendant: Broad River Logistics, LLC and Abigail Nicole Wright
Case Number: 1:2019cv00207
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Broad River Logistics, LLC (Jeffries, John)
August 14, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Broad River Logistics, LLC.(Jeffries, John)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting Deft Broad River Logistics, LLC's #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint. Broad River Logistics, LLC answer due 8/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 7/24/2019. (ejb)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Broad River Logistics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jeffries, John). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John T. Jeffries on behalf of Broad River Logistics, LLC, Abigail Nicole Wright (Jeffries, John)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Saymon Faria. Broad River Logistics, LLC served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Martin, Dennis)
July 1, 2019 Notice to Jose A. Raposo, Jr.: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 7/8/2019. (khm)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Jose A. Raposo, Jr. for Saymon Faria. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 6/28/2019. (khm)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added John Lukacs, Jr. for Saymon Faria. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 6/28/2019. (khm)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to John Lukacs, Jr. Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4079102. by Saymon Faria. (Martin, Dennis). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jose A. Raposo, Jr. Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4079003. by Saymon Faria. (Martin, Dennis). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Broad River Logistics, LLC, Abigail Nicole Wright. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (khm)
June 27, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (khm)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ann-Patton Hornthal on behalf of Saymon Faria (Hornthal, Ann-Patton)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4077777), filed by Saymon Faria.(Martin, Dennis) Modified text of who case is filed against on 6/27/2019. NEF Regenerate. (ejb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Faria v. Wright et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broad River Logistics, LLC
Represented By: John T. Jeffries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abigail Nicole Wright
Represented By: John T. Jeffries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saymon Faria
Represented By: Ann-Patton Hornthal
Represented By: Dennis Lee Martin, Jr.
Represented By: John C. Lukacs, Jr.
Represented By: Jose A. Raposo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?