Clements v. Saul
Plaintiff: Clyde Clements, Jr.
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv00216
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Robert J Conrad
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by George Davidson on behalf of Andrew Saul (Davidson, George)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed, Social Security Administration (SSA) served on 8/9/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. (reh)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically to U.S. Marshal for service as to Andrew Saul, US Attorney and US Attorney General. (Attachment: #1 USM-285 Forms) (maf) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/7/2019) (maf).
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr. on 8/6/2019. (maf)
July 8, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (maf)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Clyde Clements, Jr.. (Hall, Charlotte)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by Clyde Clements, Jr..(Hall, Charlotte)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clements v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: George Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clyde Clements, Jr.
Represented By: Charlotte Williams Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?