Harding v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Plaintiff: Venus L. Harding
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00222
Filed: July 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Referring Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: 5 days. Discovery due by 4/5/2020. Mediation deadline set for 4/19/2020. Motions due by 5/5/2020. Ready date for trial: 10/5/2020 at 9:31 AM in Courtroom 1, 100 Otis St, Asheville, NC 28801 before District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 9/5/2019. (khm)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 Joint CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Arnold, Ryan)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Michel Arnold on behalf of Norfolk Southern Railway Company (Arnold, Ryan)
August 15, 2019 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 9/5/2019. (khm)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Norfolk Southern Railway Company (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kelly, Christopher)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kelly, Christopher)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT per Rule 15(a)1(A) with Jury Demand against Norfolk Southern Railway Company, filed by Venus L. Harding.(Francis, Daniel)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Norfolk Southern Railway Company. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (ejb)
July 15, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (ejb)
July 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Norfolk Southern Railway Company with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4094252), filed by Venus L Harding. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Francis, Daniel) Modified text on 7/14/2019 to correct party whom case is filed against. NEF Regenerated. (ejb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harding v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: Ryan Michel Arnold
Represented By: Christopher M. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Venus L. Harding
Represented By: Daniel R. Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?