Global Locating Systems LLC v. ShadowTrack 247, LLC
Plaintiff: Global Locating Systems LLC
Defendant: ShadowTrack 247, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00225
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 9/26/2019. (ni)
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ShadowTrack 247, LLC (Wilkerson, David)
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint, by ShadowTrack 247, LLC.(Wilkerson, David)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #5 Amended Complaint,. ShadowTrack 247, LLC answer due 9/4/2019. Text of Order: The Defendant's Motion is GRANTED, and the Defendant shall have through and including September 4, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint. So Ordered. Entered by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 8/7/19. (LMR)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #5 Amended Complaint, by ShadowTrack 247, LLC. (Wilkerson, David)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Global Locating Systems LLC. ShadowTrack 247, LLC served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Olive, Susan)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED REPORT on the Filing of an action regarding patent number 10,165,052 contained in #5 Amended Complaint. (ejb)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement (U.S. Patent 10,165,052) with Jury Demand against ShadowTrack 247, LLC, filed by Global Locating Systems LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent 10,165,052, #2 Exhibit B - Claim Chart, U.S. 10,165,052 vs ST-Solo Tracking Device)(Olive, Susan)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to ShadowTrack 247, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (ejb)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT on the Filing of an action regarding patent trademark number 10,167,052 contained in #1 Complaint. (ejb) Modified text on 7/19/2019 (ejb).
July 19, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Martin Reidinger. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (ejb)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Global Locating Systems LLC (Olive, Susan)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement (U.S. Patent 10,165,052) against ShadowTrack 247, LLC with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4102482), filed by Global Locating Systems LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent 10,165,052, #2 Exhibit B - Claim Chart, U.S. 10,165,052 vs ST-Solo Tracking Device)(Olive, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Global Locating Systems LLC v. ShadowTrack 247, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Global Locating Systems LLC
Represented By: Susan Freya Olive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ShadowTrack 247, LLC
Represented By: David M. Wilkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?