Rich v. Verizon Wireless Services, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Rich
Defendant: Equifax Inc., Verizon Wireless Services, LLC and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00234
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 10/7/2019. (ejb)
September 16, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Verizon Wireless Services, LLC.(Cleary, Patrick) Modified text on 9/16/2019 (ejb).
September 13, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Brathwaite, Ashley)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Text of Order: Defendant Verizon Wireless Services, LLC.'s Motion is GRANTED, and Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby extended to and including September 16, 2019. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 9/3/2019. (NT)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Text of Order: Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.'s Motion is GRANTED, and Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby extended to and including September 13, 2019. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 9/3/2019. (NT)
August 30, 2019 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Verizon Wireless Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cleary, Patrick). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
August 30, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Verizon Wireless Services, LLC (Cleary, Patrick)
August 30, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick James Cleary on behalf of Verizon Wireless Services, LLC (Cleary, Patrick)
August 30, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Brathwaite, Ashley)
August 30, 2019 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brathwaite, Ashley). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
August 29, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Inc. (Corey, Chelsea)
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Equifax Inc..(Corey, Chelsea)
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Chelsea Corey on behalf of Equifax Inc. (Corey, Chelsea)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Rich. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. (Kerney, Frank)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Rich. Verizon Wireless Services, LLC served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. (Kerney, Frank)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Rich. Equifax Inc. served on 8/8/2019, answer due 8/29/2019. (Kerney, Frank)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Daniel Rich (Kerney, Frank)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Verizon Wireless Services, LLC, Equifax Inc., and Experian Information Solutions, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. (ejb)
August 2, 2019 Notice to Frank H. Kerney, III: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline for ECF registration is 8/9/2019. (maf)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Court GRANTS the #2 Motion and ADMITS Frank H. Kerney, III to practice pro hac vice before the Court in this matter while associated with local counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 8/1/2019. (maf)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Frank H. Kerney, III Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4119815. by Daniel Rich. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gwaltney, Karl). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
July 31, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (ejb)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4118598), filed by Daniel Rich. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Gwaltney, Karl) Modified on 7/31/2019 to correct Pltf's name from RICH DANIEL to Daniel Rich. NEF Regenerated. (ejb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rich v. Verizon Wireless Services, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Inc.
Represented By: Chelsea Corey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Wireless Services, LLC
Represented By: Patrick James Cleary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley Kamphaus Brathwaite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Rich
Represented By: Karl S. Gwaltney
Represented By: Frank H. Kerney, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?