Oppenheimer v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: David Oppenheimer
Defendant: Highlands at Cullowhee, LLC, JOMCO, Inc. and Joseph Riley Johnson
Case Number: 1:2019cv00240
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Oppenheimer. Highlands at Cullowhee, LLC served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019. (LeJune, Dana)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to Joseph Riley Johnson, Highlands at Cullowhee, LLC, and JOMCO, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (ejb)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT on the filing of a copyright action regarding copyright numbers VAu 1-156-824. (ejb)
August 13, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Martin Reidinger. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (ejb)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to HAC on 8/15/19 by David Oppenheimer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Waiver)(LeJune, Dana)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to JOMCO, Inc. on 8/15/19 by David Oppenheimer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Waiver)(LeJune, Dana)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Joseph Riley Johnson on 8/15/19 by David Oppenheimer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Waiver)(LeJune, Dana) Modified name of party Request for Waiver of Service sent to on 8/13/2019. NEF Regenerated. (ejb)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4135145), filed by David Oppenheimer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Aerial Photograph, #2 Exhibit 2 - CR, #3 Exhibit 3 - Infringement, #4 Exhibit 4 - C&D Letter 2-5-19)(LeJune, Dana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oppenheimer v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Oppenheimer
Represented By: Dana A. LeJune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highlands at Cullowhee, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOMCO, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Riley Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?