United States of America v. Clark et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Charles Douglas Clark, Karen L. Clark and North Carolina Department of Revenue
Case Number: 1:2019cv00247
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7403
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 10/29/2019. (ejb)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Charles Douglas Clark, Karen L. Clark.(Holman, E.)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by North Carolina Department of Revenue. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CTL, #2 Exhibit CTL)(Lennon, David)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David Dalton Lennon on behalf of North Carolina Department of Revenue (Lennon, David)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Charles Douglas Clark answer due 10/7/2019; Karen L. Clark answer due 10/7/2019. Text of Order: For the reasons stated therein, the Motion is allowed and the deadline for Defendants Charles Douglas Clark and Karen L. Clark to file their answers or other responses to Plaintiff's complaint is extended to and including October 7, 2019. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 9/13/2019. (WCM)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint,, by Charles Douglas Clark, Karen L. Clark. (Holman, E.). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by E. Thomison Holman on behalf of Charles Douglas Clark, Karen L. Clark (Holman, E.)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Charles Douglas Clark, Karen L. Clark, North Carolina Department of Revenue. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (khm)
August 23, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(khm)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, General Warranty Deed, #2 Exhibit B, General Warranty Deed, #3 Exhibit C, General Warranty Deed, #4 Exhibit D, General Warranty Deed, #5 Exhibit E, General Warranty Deed, #6 Exhibit F, Property Combination Notice and Affidavit, #7 Exhibit G, General Warranty Deed, #8 Summons to Charles D. Clark, #9 Summons to Karen L. Clark, #10 Summons to North Carolina Department of Revenue)(O'Donnell, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Clark et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Douglas Clark
Represented By: E. Thomison Holman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen L. Clark
Represented By: E. Thomison Holman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Carolina Department of Revenue
Represented By: David Dalton Lennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Sean Paul O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?