Bradley v. Saul
Plaintiff: Jenny Bradley
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv00261
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 11/08/2019. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (ejb)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that the Plaintiff's action is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 11/08/2019. (ejb)
September 16, 2019 Set Deadlines: Amended IFP Motion due by 10/16/2019. (ni)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER (Sealed - Participants) denying without prejudice #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall file an Amended Application to Proceed Without Paying within 30 days of entry of this Order. Failure to file within time required will result in dismissal of this action without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 09/16/2019. (ni)
September 13, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Martin Reidinger. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(reh)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jenny Bradley. (Piemonte, George)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by Jenny Bradley.(Piemonte, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradley v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenny Bradley
Represented By: George C. Piemonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?