Crawford v. Burke County District Attorney's Office et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Gene Crawford
Defendant: Burke County Sheriff's Office, Michelle Ledford, Lisa Belle, Burke County District Attorney's Office and Wayne Clontz
Case Number: 1:2019cv00307
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 Prisoner Admin Remedy Statement by Christopher Gene Crawford. (Attachments: #1 Trusts Fund Account Statement, #2 Envelope)(khm)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Prisoner Trust Account Statement of Plaintiff. Signed by Clerk of Court on 11/14/19. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(reh)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of Instructions. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(khm)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT - 1983 Application IFP (Sealed - Participants) by Christopher Gene Crawford. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (khm)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Burke County District Attorney's Office, Burke County Sheriff's Office, filed by Christopher Gene Crawford. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (khm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2019: #2 Complaint Alleging Negligence) (khm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crawford v. Burke County District Attorney's Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burke County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Ledford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Belle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burke County District Attorney's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Clontz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Gene Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?