Nguyen v. Jones et al
Plaintiff: Minh Van Nguyen
Defendant: Dana Elborn Jones, III and Milan Supply Chain Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00337
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 23:134
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Minh Van Nguyen. Dana Elborn Jones, III waiver sent on 12/6/2019, answer due 2/4/2020. (Kirby, David)
January 14, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Minh Van Nguyen. Milan Supply Chain Solutions, Inc. waiver sent on 12/6/2019, answer due 2/4/2020. (Kirby, David)
January 9, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE sent to Dana Elborn Jones, III on 12/6/2019 by Minh Van Nguyen. (Kirby, David) Modified text on 1/14/2020 to change from Waiver of Service to Request for Waiver of Service. (khm)
January 9, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE sent to Milan Supply Chain Solutions, Inc., by Minh Van Nguyen. (Kirby, David) Modified text on 1/14/2020 to change event from Waiver of Service to Request for Waiver of Service. (khm) (Main Document 4 replaced on 1/14/2020) (khm).
December 6, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Minh Van Nguyen (Kurth, Mary)
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Dana Elborn Jones, III, Milan Supply Chain Solutions, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (khm)
December 6, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(khm)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4288779), filed by Minh Van Nguyen.(Kurth, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nguyen v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Elborn Jones, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milan Supply Chain Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minh Van Nguyen
Represented By: David F. Kirby
Represented By: Mary Kathryn Kurth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?