Hodge v. North Carolina Department of Public Safety et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Hodge
Defendant: Division of Adult Correction and Juvenile Justice and North Carolina Department of Public Safety
Case Number: 1:2020cv00016
Filed: January 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Division of Adult Correction and Juvenile Justice, North Carolina Department of Public Safety.(Johnson, Charles)
March 13, 2020 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 4/3/2020. (maf)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. All Defendants. Text of Order: ORDER: Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint is GRANTED and Defendants' deadline to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is EXTENDED through and including March 13, 2020. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 2/19/20. (kkb)
February 18, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew R. Wagner on behalf of All Defendants (Wagner, Andrew)
February 18, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Wester on behalf of All Defendants (Wester, John)
February 18, 2020 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Division of Adult Correction and Juvenile Justice, North Carolina Department of Public Safety. (Johnson, Charles). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Laura E. Reasons for Matthew Hodge. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 2/04/2020. (ejb)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Adam J. Levitt for Matthew Hodge. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 2/04/2020. (ejb)
February 4, 2020 Notice to Attorney Laura E. Reasons: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 2/11/2020. (ejb)
February 4, 2020 Notice to Attorney Adam J. Levitt: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 2/11/2020. (ejb)
February 3, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Laura E. Reasons Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4368867. by Matthew Hodge. (Wallace, Patrick). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
February 3, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Adam J. Levitt Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4368841. by Matthew Hodge. (Wallace, Patrick). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
January 16, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to North Carolina Department of Public Safety, Division of Adult Correction and Juvenile Justice. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (ejb)
January 16, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Matthew Hodge (Wallace, Patrick)
January 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick M. Wallace on behalf of Matthew Hodge (Wallace, Patrick)
January 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Kent Bryson on behalf of Matthew Hodge (Bryson, Daniel)
January 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Division of Adult Correction and Juvenile Justice, North Carolina Department of Public Safety with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4346756), filed by Matthew Hodge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Bryson, Daniel)
January 16, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (ejb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hodge v. North Carolina Department of Public Safety et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Hodge
Represented By: Patrick M. Wallace
Represented By: Daniel Kent Bryson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Division of Adult Correction and Juvenile Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Carolina Department of Public Safety
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?