McCluney et al v. Morley et al
Plaintiff: Justin Thomas McCluney, Jeremiah Saddler McCluney and Justin Timmons McCluney
Defendant: Richard Morley, Rick Morley Trucking and Richard Mason Morley
Case Number: 1:2020cv00048
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Jeremiah Saddler McCluney, Justin Timmons McCluney (Davies, Hannah)
March 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jeremiah Saddler McCluney, Justin Timmons McCluney (Davies, Hannah)
February 28, 2020 Mediator advised case settled. Agreement for entry of judgment or a stipulation of dismissal to be filed within 30 days or the court will dismiss the case without prejudice. Case Settlement Deadline 3/30/2020. (kby)
February 27, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT of Mediation. Outcome of Mediation: Completely Settled. (Goldsmith, C.)
February 18, 2020 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 3/10/2020. (maf)
February 17, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rick Morley Trucking (Smith, Allen)
February 17, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Richard Mason Morley, Rick Morley Trucking.(Smith, Allen)
February 14, 2020 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (maf)
February 14, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Allen C. Smith on behalf of Richard Mason Morley and Rick Morley Trucking. (Smith, Allen) Modified on 2/14/2020. (maf)
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Rutherford County Superior Court, case number 19-CVS-1480. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4385626), filed by Rick Morley Trucking, Richard Mason Morley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons, #3 Exhibit C - Acceptance of Service)(Smith, Allen) Modified docket text on 2/14/2020. (maf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCluney et al v. Morley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Thomas McCluney
Represented By: Hannah Michal Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremiah Saddler McCluney
Represented By: Hannah Michal Davies
Represented By: Joshua B. Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Timmons McCluney
Represented By: Hannah Michal Davies
Represented By: Joshua B. Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Morley
Represented By: Allen C. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Morley Trucking
Represented By: Allen C. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Mason Morley
Represented By: Allen C. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?