Doe v. Lees-McRae College et al
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Lees-McRae College, Jon Driggers, Lee King and Joshua Gaisser
Case Number: 1:2020cv00105
Filed: April 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Jon Driggers, Joshua Gaisser, Lee King, Lees-McRae College. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Cash v. Lees-McRae College, No. 19-1135, #2 Exhibit 2 - LMC Student Handbook)(Hartzog, Katie)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Jon Driggers, Joshua Gaisser, Lee King, Lees-McRae College. Responses due by 7/10/2020 (Hartzog, Katie). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lees-McRae College (Hartzog, Katie)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael B. Cohen on behalf of Jon Driggers, Joshua Gaisser, Lee King, Lees-McRae College (Cohen, Michael)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Katie Weaver Hartzog on behalf of Jon Driggers, Joshua Gaisser, Lee King, Lees-McRae College (Hartzog, Katie)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Doe. Lee King waiver sent on 4/29/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Lindsay, Stephen) Modified answer due date on 5/5/2020, regenerated NEF (reh).
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Doe. Joshua Gaisser waiver sent on 4/29/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Lindsay, Stephen) Modified answer due date on 5/5/2020, regenerated NEF (reh).
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Doe. Jon Driggers waiver sent on 4/29/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Lindsay, Stephen) Modified answer due date on 5/5/2020, regenerated NEF (reh).
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Doe. Lees-McRae College waiver sent on 4/29/2020, answer due 6/29/2020. (Lindsay, Stephen) Modified answer due date on 5/5/2020, regenerated NEF (reh).
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Katie Hartzog (Attorney for Defendants) on 5/5/20 by John Doe. (Lindsay, Stephen) Modified text on 5/5/2020 (reh).
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4477425), filed by John Doe.(Lindsay, Stephen) Modified text on 4/29/2020 (ni). Modified text on 4/29/2020 (rth).
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Case assigned to District Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(ni)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Lees-McRae College et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lees-McRae College
Represented By: Michael B. Cohen
Represented By: Katie Weaver Hartzog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Driggers
Represented By: Michael B. Cohen
Represented By: Katie Weaver Hartzog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee King
Represented By: Michael B. Cohen
Represented By: Katie Weaver Hartzog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Gaisser
Represented By: Michael B. Cohen
Represented By: Katie Weaver Hartzog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Stephen P. Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?