Homburg v. Financial Business and Consumer Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dieter Homburg
Defendant: Caddis Funding, LLC and Financial Business and Consumer Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00142
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Caddis Funding, LLC answer due 8/12/2020. Text of Order: ORDER: The Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint is GRANTED, and the deadline for Defendant Caddis Funding, LLC to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is EXTENDED by seven (7) days, through and including August 12, 2020. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 8/5/2020. (kkb)
August 5, 2020 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Caddis Funding, LLC. (Dixon, Joshua). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Caddis Funding, LLC answer due 8/5/2020. Text of Order: ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the Motion, and it appearing that Mr. Dixon has made an appearance on behalf of Caddis Funding, LLC, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint is GRANTED, and the deadline for Caddis Funding, LLC to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is EXTENDED through and including August 5, 2020. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 7/16/2020. (kkb)
July 15, 2020 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Caddis Funding, LLC. (Dixon, Joshua). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. The deadline for Defendant Financial Business and Consumer Solutions, Inc. d/b/a FBSC, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is EXTENDED by 21 days, through and including 8/11/2020. The request to extend the deadline by which Caddis Funding, LLC must answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 7/15/2020. (khm)
July 14, 2020 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Financial Business and Consumer Solutions, Inc.. (Dixon, Joshua). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
July 2, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dieter Homburg. Caddis Funding, LLC served on 6/24/2020, answer due 7/15/2020. (Brown, Chris)
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Financial Business and Consumer Solutions, Inc. and Caddis Funding, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachment: #1 Summons - Caddis Funding, LLC) (maf)
June 12, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (maf)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Caddis Funding, LLC, Financial Business and Consumer Solutions, Inc. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4529250), filed by Dieter Homburg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - December 13, 2019 Letter from FBCS, #2 Exhibit B - Dispute Letter to FBCS, #3 Exhibit C - FBCS's January 15, 2020 Letter, #4 Cover Sheet)(Brown, Chris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Homburg v. Financial Business and Consumer Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caddis Funding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Financial Business and Consumer Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dieter Homburg
Represented By: Chris J. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?