Blackwell v. Palmer et al
Plaintiff: JASON BLACKWELL
Defendant: MARK ALAN THIGPEN, Cherokee County, Ohio Casualty Corporation, LARRY KEVIN BOLEN, Jeremy Bresch, Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, MARK LEE PATTERSON, FRANCIS "FRANK" PATRICK DALY, III, GLENN EDWARD HOLLOWAY, TIFFANY ANN ENLOE, PATRICK CODY WILLIAMS, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Derrick Palmer, Cherokee County Sheriff's Department, MICHAEL TYLER FAGGARD, Michael Faggard, Ohio Casualty Insurance Co., Patrick Williams, Tiffany Enloe, Mark Thigpen, Frank Daly, Mark Patterson, Ohio Casualty Corp., Larry Bolen, Glenn Holloway and Liberty Mutual Insurance Co.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00146
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Larry Bolen, Jeremy Bresch, Tiffany Enloe, Glenn Holloway, Mark Thigpen.(Flanagan, Patrick)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Larry Bolen answer due 8/7/2020; Jeremy Bresch answer due 8/7/2020; Tiffany Enloe answer due 8/7/2020; Glenn Holloway answer due 8/7/2020; Mark Thigpen answer due 8/7/2020. Text of Order: ORDER: The Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is GRANTED, and the deadline for defendants Mark Thigpen, Jeremy Bresch, Larry Bolen, Glenn Holloway, and Tiffany Enloe to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is EXTENDED through and including August 7, 2020. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 7/15/2020. (kkb)
July 15, 2020 Filing 20 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Larry Bolen, Jeremy Bresch, Tiffany Enloe, Glenn Holloway, Mark Thigpen. (Flanagan, Patrick). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
July 7, 2020 Filing 19 Summons Reissued (to new address) Electronically as to Tiffany Enloe. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. (maf)
July 6, 2020 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Jason Blackwell. Larry Bolen served on 6/29/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. (Boyle, W.)
June 29, 2020 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Jason Blackwell. Jeremy Bresch served on 6/26/2020, answer due 7/17/2020. (Boyle, W.)
June 29, 2020 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Jason Blackwell. Glenn Holloway served on 6/26/2020, answer due 7/17/2020. (Boyle, W.)
June 29, 2020 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Jason Blackwell. Mark Thigpen served on 6/26/2020, answer due 7/17/2020. (Boyle, W.)
June 25, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ohio Casualty Insurance Co.. Ohio Casualty Insurance Co. waiver sent on 6/24/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Perrin, Sean)
June 25, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Derrick Palmer. Derrick Palmer waiver sent on 6/24/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Perrin, Sean)
June 25, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mark Patterson. Mark Patterson waiver sent on 6/24/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Perrin, Sean)
June 25, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cherokee County Sheriff's Department. Cherokee County Sheriff's Department waiver sent on 6/24/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Perrin, Sean)
June 25, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Patrick Williams. Patrick Williams waiver sent on 6/24/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Perrin, Sean)
June 25, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Co.. Liberty Mutual Insurance Co. waiver sent on 6/24/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Perrin, Sean)
June 25, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ohio Casualty Corp.. Ohio Casualty Corp. waiver sent on 6/24/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Perrin, Sean)
June 25, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Frank Daly. Frank Daly waiver sent on 6/24/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Perrin, Sean)
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cherokee County. Cherokee County waiver sent on 6/24/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Perrin, Sean)
June 25, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michael Faggard. Michael Faggard waiver sent on 6/24/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Perrin, Sean)
June 19, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Larry Bolen, Jeremy Bresch, Cherokee County, Cherokee County Sheriff's Department, Frank Daly, Tiffany Enloe, Michael Faggard, Glenn Holloway, Liberty Mutual Insurance Co., Ohio Casualty Corp., Ohio Casualty Insurance Co., Derrick Palmer, Mark Patterson, Mark Thigpen, and Patrick Williams. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (maf)
June 18, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (maf)
June 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Winslow Taylor on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Taylor, Edward)
June 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Ellis Boyle on behalf of Jason Blackwell(Boyle, W.) Modified docket text on 6/18/2020. (maf)
June 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee, $400 receipt number 0419-4536661), filed by Jason Blackwell.(Boyle, W.) (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) Modified docket text and added attachment on 6/18/2020. (maf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blackwell v. Palmer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK ALAN THIGPEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherokee County
Represented By: Sean F. Perrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Casualty Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LARRY KEVIN BOLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Bresch
Represented By: Patrick Houghton Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK LEE PATTERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANCIS "FRANK" PATRICK DALY, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLENN EDWARD HOLLOWAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIFFANY ANN ENLOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICK CODY WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derrick Palmer
Represented By: Sean F. Perrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherokee County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: Sean F. Perrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL TYLER FAGGARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Faggard
Represented By: Sean F. Perrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Casualty Insurance Co.
Represented By: Sean F. Perrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Williams
Represented By: Sean F. Perrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Enloe
Represented By: Patrick Houghton Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Thigpen
Represented By: Patrick Houghton Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Daly
Represented By: Sean F. Perrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Patterson
Represented By: Sean F. Perrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Casualty Corp.
Represented By: Sean F. Perrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Bolen
Represented By: Patrick Houghton Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Holloway
Represented By: Patrick Houghton Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Co.
Represented By: Sean F. Perrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON BLACKWELL
Represented By: W. Ellis Boyle
Represented By: Edward Winslow Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?