Case et al v. UniFirst Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Carol Case and Lewis Mark Case
Defendant: Unifirst Corporation and Roger Owens, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00179
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 23:134
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery Requests Text of Order: ORDER: The Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Discovery is GRANTED, and the deadline for Defendants to respond to Plaintiffs' August 3, 2020 interrogatories and requests for production is EXTENDED through and including October 2, 2020. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 8/31/2020. (kkb)
August 30, 2020 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery Requests by Roger Owens, Jr, UniFirst Corporation. Responses due by 9/14/2020 (Dedman, James). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT ORDER granting #9 Consent Motion Allowing Production of "Employee Personnel Record" Pursuant to N.C. Gen. Stat. 153A-98. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 8/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (ejb)
August 11, 2020 Filing 10 DESIGNATION of Jason James as Mediator by all the parties. (Greer, Michael)
August 10, 2020 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Order Permitting Release of Employment Records by Roger Owens, Jr, UniFirst Corporation. Responses due by 8/24/2020 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - Subpoena for Henderson County Employment Records, #3 Exhibit B - List of Documents to Be Produced) (Dedman, James). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: 7 days. Discovery due by 5/10/2021. Motions due by 6/8/2021. Mediator Designation deadline set for 8/11/2020. Mediation deadline set for 5/25/2021. Jury Trial set for 11/8/2021 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1, 100 Otis St, Asheville, NC 28801 before Chief Judge Martin Reidinger. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 7/21/2020. (kby)
July 16, 2020 Filing 7 Joint CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Dedman, James)
July 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing of Acknowledgment of State Court by Roger Owens, Jr, UniFirst Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Acknowledgment of State Court)(Dedman, James)
July 10, 2020 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by7/31/2020. (kby)
July 10, 2020 **PLEASE DISREGARD, docketed in error (kby).
July 10, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(kby)
July 8, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal, by Roger Owens, Jr, Unifirst Corporation.(Dedman, James)
July 8, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Unifirst Corporation (Dedman, James)
July 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Dedman, IV on behalf of Roger Owens, Jr (Dedman, James)
July 8, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Dedman, IV on behalf of Unifirst Corporation (Dedman, James)
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Buncombe County Superior Court, case number 20-CVS-02102. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4566533), filed by Roger Owens, Jr, Unifirst Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Summons, #3 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Proposed Acknowledgment of State Court, #5 Certificate of Service)(Dedman, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Case et al v. UniFirst Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Case
Represented By: Michael Jerry Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lewis Mark Case
Represented By: Michael Jerry Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unifirst Corporation
Represented By: James M. Dedman, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Owens, Jr.
Represented By: James M. Dedman, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?