Perlman et al v. P.F. Chang's China Bistro, Inc.
Plaintiff: Carolyn Perlman, Toni Perlman and Bruce Perlman
Defendant: P.F. Chang's China Bistro, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00194
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Mediator Designation deadline set for 10/2/2020. Discovery due by 5/10/2021. Mediation deadline set for 5/25/2021. Motions due by 6/8/2021. Estimated Trial Time: 3 days. Jury Trial set for term beginning on 11/8/2021 in Asheville, NC 28801 before Chief Judge Martin Reidinger. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 9/11/2020. (maf)
September 11, 2020 Minute Entry: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held before Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Plaintiffs attorney: Charles David Jones, James H. Webb, Jr., and Neal Weller Stanifer. Defendants attorney: Christopher Andrew Page and Caitlin Anne Mitchell. An initial pretrial conference was held by telephone September 11, 2020 with Charles David Jones, James H. Webb, Jr., and Neal Weller Stanifer participating on behalf of Plaintiffs Carolyn Perlman and Bruce Perlman and Christopher Andrew Page and Caitlin Anne Mitchell participating on behalf of Defendant P.F. Chang's China Bistro, Inc. A pretrial order will issue. (kkb)
September 2, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 9/11/2020 01:00 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Counsel for the parties shall call into the conference line five minutes prior to the conference. This is your only hearing notice - The Clerk will provide counsel with conference call-in information by separate email.(kby)
August 31, 2020 Filing 11 Joint CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Page, Christopher)
August 25, 2020 Notice to Charles D. Jones: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 9/1/2020. (khm)
August 25, 2020 Notice to James H. Webb, Jr.: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 9/1/2020. (khm)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Charles D. Jones for Bruce Perlman and Carolyn Perlman. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 8/25/2020. (khm)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added James H. Webb, Jr. for Bruce Perlman and Carolyn Perlman. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 8/25/2020. (khm)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Charles D. Jones Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4633619. by Bruce Perlman, Carolyn Perlman. (Stanifer, Neal). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to James H. Webb Jr. Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4633420. by Bruce Perlman, Carolyn Perlman. (Stanifer, Neal). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
August 12, 2020 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 9/2/2020. (ni)
August 12, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal,, by P.F. Chang's China Bistro, Inc..(Page, Christopher)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. P.F. Chang's China Bistro, Inc. answer due 8/12/2020. Text of Order: ORDER: Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint is GRANTED, and the deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is EXTENDED by fourteen days, through and including August 12, 2020. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 7/30/2020. (kkb)
July 29, 2020 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal, by P.F. Chang's China Bistro, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Page, Christopher). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
July 23, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by P.F. Chang's China Bistro, Inc. (Page, Christopher)
July 22, 2020 Notice to Attorney Neal W. Stanifer: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Satisfy the Requirements for Admission to the Bar of this Court. Once admitted to the Bar of this Court you will then need to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 7/29/2020. (ejb)
July 22, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (ejb)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Caitlin Anne Mitchell on behalf of P.F. Chang's China Bistro, Inc. (Mitchell, Caitlin) Modified text on 7/22/2020 (ejb).
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Andrew Page on behalf of P.F. Chang's China Bistro, Inc. (Page, Christopher) Modified text on 7/22/2020 (ejb).
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Buncombe County Superior Court, case number 20 CvS 02406. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4585759), filed by P.F. Chang's China Bistro, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Civil Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiffs' Pro Hac Vice Application with Supporting Documents, and Order granting PHV Motion in State Court)(Page, Christopher) (Attachment 2 replaced with corrected .pdf, and modified text of Attachment 2 on 7/29/2020. NEF Regenerated (ejb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perlman et al v. P.F. Chang's China Bistro, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Perlman
Represented By: Neal W. Stanifer
Represented By: Charles David Jones
Represented By: Neal Weller Stanifer
Represented By: James H. Webb, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toni Perlman
Represented By: Neal W. Stanifer
Represented By: Charles David Jones
Represented By: Neal Weller Stanifer
Represented By: James H. Webb, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Perlman
Represented By: Neal W. Stanifer
Represented By: Charles David Jones
Represented By: Neal Weller Stanifer
Represented By: James H. Webb, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.F. Chang's China Bistro, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Andrew Page
Represented By: Caitlin Anne Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?