Charles v. State of North Carolina
Petitioner: James Benjamin Charles
Respondent: State of North Carolina
Case Number: 1:2020cv00196
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Filing Fee Received: $ 5.00, receipt number CHD061226 (tlj)
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 Letter from James Benjamin Charles with $5.00 check enclosed. Clerk forwarded to Charlotte for receipt. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(reh)
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. The filing fee of $5.00 was not received or application to proceed without payment of fees and affidavit was not submitted. Application or Fee due by 8/13/2020. (rth)
July 22, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger. (rth)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM OF LAW & ORDER as to James Benjamin Charles (1). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: Defendant James Benjamin Charles' Pro Se Motion to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 120 is deemed a motion to vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2254 and is TRANSFERRED to the District Court for the Western District of North Carolina. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 7/20/2020 (transferred from U.S. District Court, District of Minnesota). (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(rth)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 Pro Se PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by James Benjamin Charles (transferred from U.S. District Court, District of Minnesota).(rth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charles v. State of North Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of North Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Benjamin Charles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?