Stroud v. Tapp et al
Plaintiff: Dominic Stroud
Defendant: FNU Stadhim, FNU Truax and FNU Tapp
Case Number: 1:2020cv00226
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (Sealed - Court) filed directly by Dominic Stroud. (maf)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Waiving Initial Partial Filing Fee and Directing Monthly Payments be Made from Prison Account of DOMINIC STROUD. Directing correctional facility to transmit payments. Signed by the Clerk of Court on 09/08/2020. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (hms)
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (Sealed - Court) by Dominic Stroud (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tlj)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Prisoner Trust Account Statement of Plaintiff. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(hms)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S STANDING ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Clerk of Court on 8/19/2020. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ni)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT - 1983 Application IFP (Sealed - Participants) by Dominic Stroud. (ni) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2020: #1 Envelope) (ni).
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FNU Stadhim, FNU Tapp, FNU Truax filed by Dominic Stroud. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ni)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stroud v. Tapp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominic Stroud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Stadhim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Truax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Tapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?