WASCO LLC v. Northrop Grumman Corporation et al
Plaintiff: WASCO LLC
Defendant: WMI II, LLC, McGregor II, LLC, Smokey Mountain Pallet, Inc., Samsonite LLC, Blue Ridge Industrial Support Co., CNA Holdings LLC, Dyna-Diggr LLC, Chemtronics, Inc., Northrop Grumman Corporation and Gildan USA Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00227
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:9607
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 68 MEMORANDUM in Support re #67 MOTION to Dismiss by McGregor II, LLC, Samsonite LLC. (Rickers, Amy)
October 14, 2020 Filing 67 MOTION to Dismiss by McGregor II, LLC, Samsonite LLC. Responses due by 10/28/2020 (Rickers, Amy)
October 12, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #66 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #56 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Responses due by 10/28/2020 Text of Order: The Plaintiff's Motion is GRANTED, and the Plaintiff shall have an additional fourteen (14) days, through and including October 28, 2020, within which to respond to Northrop, CNA Holdings and Chemtronics' Motion to Dismiss. So Ordered. Entered by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 10/12/20. (LMR)
October 12, 2020 Filing 66 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #56 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by WASCO LLC. Responses due by 10/26/2020 (Sullivan, Sean)
October 9, 2020 Filing 65 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CNA Holdings LLC (Williamson, Stephen)
October 9, 2020 Filing 64 AFFIDAVIT of Service [Northrop, McGregor and Samsonite] by WASCO LLC (DeGeorge, R.)
October 9, 2020 Filing 63 MEMORANDUM in Support re #62 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Gildan USA Inc.. (Reschly, Marla)
October 9, 2020 Filing 62 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Gildan USA Inc.. Responses due by 10/23/2020 (Reschly, Marla)
October 6, 2020 Filing 61 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chemtronics, Inc. (Williamson, Stephen)
October 5, 2020 Filing 60 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Blue Ridge Industrial Support Co., Dyna-Diggr LLC (Clarke, William)
October 2, 2020 Filing 59 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Blue Ridge Industrial Support Co., Dyna-Diggr LLC.(Clarke, William)
October 2, 2020 Filing 58 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Smokey Mountain Pallet, Inc..(Agan, Stephen)
October 1, 2020 Magistrate Judge David Keesler no longer assigned to case. (khm)
September 30, 2020 Filing 57 MEMORANDUM in Support re #56 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by CNA Holdings LLC, Chemtronics, Inc., Northrop Grumman Corporation. (Williamson, Stephen)
September 30, 2020 Filing 56 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by CNA Holdings LLC, Chemtronics, Inc., Northrop Grumman Corporation. Responses due by 10/14/2020 (Williamson, Stephen). Motions referred to David Keesler.
September 28, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert D. Fox on behalf of CNA Holdings LLC (Fox, Robert)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting with modification #51 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Gildan USA Inc. answer due 10/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/25/2020. (reh)
September 25, 2020 Notice to Joel E. Antwi: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 10/2/2020. (reh)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #49 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Joel E. Antwi for McGregor II, LLC and Samsonite LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/25/2020. (reh)
September 25, 2020 Notice to Christian W. Habersaat: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 10/2/2020. (reh)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #48 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Christian W. Habersaat for McGregor II, LLC and Samsonite LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/25/2020. (reh)
September 25, 2020 Filing 51 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Gildan USA Inc.. (Reschly, Marla). Motions referred to David Keesler.
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #47 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. CNA Holdings LLC answer due 10/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/25/2020. (reh)
September 25, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Joel E. Antwi Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4686309. by McGregor II, LLC, Samsonite LLC. (Rickers, Amy). Motions referred to David Keesler.
September 25, 2020 Filing 48 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Christian W. Habersaat Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4686297. by McGregor II, LLC, Samsonite LLC. (Rickers, Amy). Motions referred to David Keesler.
September 24, 2020 Filing 47 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, by CNA Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Williamson, Stephen). Motions referred to David Keesler.
September 24, 2020 Set Deadlines per #44 Affidavit of Service: CNA Holdings LLC deadline to respond to the Complaint: 9/11/2020. (maf)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #45 Second Motion for Extension of Time. Deadline for Blue Ridge Industrial Support Co. and Dyna-Diggr LLC to respond to the Complaint is extended to 10/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/23/2020. (maf)
September 23, 2020 Filing 45 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, (Second Extension) by Blue Ridge Industrial Support Co., Dyna-Diggr LLC. (Hornthal, Ann-Patton). Motions referred to David Keesler.
September 22, 2020 Filing 44 AFFIDAVIT of Service by WASCO LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-proofs-BRISC, CNA, Chemo, Dyna, Gildan, SMP, #2 Exhibit B-USPS printout-McGregor, #3 Exhibit C-USPS printout-Northrop, #4 Exhibit D-USPS printout-Samsonite)(DeGeorge, R.)
September 21, 2020 Filing 43 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Samsonite LLC (Rickers, Amy)
September 21, 2020 Filing 42 Corporate Disclosure Statement by McGregor II, LLC (Rickers, Amy)
September 17, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert D. Mowrey on behalf of Northrop Grumman Corporation (Mowrey, Robert)
September 17, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by David Michael Meezan on behalf of Northrop Grumman Corporation (Meezan, David)
September 17, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by E. Peyton Nunez on behalf of Northrop Grumman Corporation (Nunez, E.)
September 17, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen B. Williamson on behalf of CNA Holdings LLC (Williamson, Stephen)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #36 Defendants Samsonite LLC, and McGregor II, LLC's, Consent Motion for Extension of Time To Respond To Plaintiff's Complaint. McGregor II, LLC answer due 10/14/2020; Samsonite LLC answer due 10/14/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/15/2020. (khm)
September 14, 2020 Filing 36 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, by McGregor II, LLC, Samsonite LLC. (Rickers, Amy). Motions referred to David Keesler.
September 14, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Lyn Rickers on behalf of McGregor II, LLC, Samsonite LLC (Rickers, Amy)
September 14, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Jill Kirk on behalf of McGregor II, LLC, Samsonite LLC (Kirk, Kimberly)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting Defendant Smokey Mountain Pallet, Inc.'s #32 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. Smokey Mountain Pallet, Inc. answer due 10/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/11/2020. (khm)
September 11, 2020 Filing 32 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Smokey Mountain Pallet, Inc.. (Agan, Stephen). Motions referred to David Keesler.
September 11, 2020 Filing 31 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Smokey Mountain Pallet, Inc. (Agan, Stephen)
September 11, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen P. Agan on behalf of Smokey Mountain Pallet, Inc. (Agan, Stephen)
September 11, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by George B. Hyler, Jr on behalf of Smokey Mountain Pallet, Inc. (Hyler, George)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting Defendant Gildan USA Inc.'s #27 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Gildan USA Inc. answer due 10/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/11/2020. (khm)
September 11, 2020 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Gildan USA Inc.. (Reschly, Marla). Motions referred to David Keesler.
September 11, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Charles Grover on behalf of Gildan USA Inc. (Grover, Ryan)
September 11, 2020 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gildan USA Inc. (Reschly, Marla)
September 11, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Marla Tun Reschly on behalf of Gildan USA Inc. (Reschly, Marla)
September 10, 2020 Notice to Attorneys E. Peyton Nunez, David M. Meezan, Robert D. Mowery: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 9/17/2020. (khm)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Robert D. Mowery for Northrop Grumman Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/10/2020. (khm)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added David M. Meezan for Northrop Grumman Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/10/2020. (khm)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added E. Peyton Nunez for Northrop Grumman Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/10/2020. (khm)
September 10, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Robert D. Mowrey Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4662034. by Northrop Grumman Corporation. (Gottschalk, Tikkun). Motions referred to David Keesler.
September 10, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David M. Meezan Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4662028. by Northrop Grumman Corporation. (Gottschalk, Tikkun). Motions referred to David Keesler.
September 10, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to E. Peyton Nunez Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4662014. by Northrop Grumman Corporation. (Gottschalk, Tikkun). Motions referred to David Keesler.
September 10, 2020 Notice to Attorney Robert D. Fox: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 9/17/2020. (khm)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Robert D. Fox for Chemtronics, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/10/2020. (khm)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting Defendants Chemtronics, Inc. and Northrop Grumman Corporation's #15 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Chemtronics, Inc. and Northrop Grumman Corporation answers due 9/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/10/2020. (khm)
September 10, 2020 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf no longer assigned to the case due to conflict. Motions referred to David Keesler: #15 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, , #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Robert Fox Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4659973. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(thh)
September 9, 2020 Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Chemtronics, Inc., Northrop Grumman Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Williamson, Stephen). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
September 9, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Robert Fox Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4659973. by Chemtronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Williamson, Stephen). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
September 9, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Deutsch on behalf of Northrop Grumman Corporation (Deutsch, Robert) Modified text on 9/9/2020. (khm)
September 9, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED NOTICE of Appearance by Tikkun A.S. Gottschalk on behalf of Northrop Grumman Corporation (Gottschalk, Tikkun) Modified text on 9/9/2020. (khm)
September 9, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen B. Williamson on behalf of Chemtronics, Inc. (Williamson, Stephen)
September 9, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Ann-Patton Hornthal on behalf of Blue Ridge Industrial Support Co., Dyna-Diggr LLC (Hornthal, Ann-Patton)
September 9, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Deutsch on behalf of Northrop Grumman Corporation (Deutsch, Robert)
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Northrop Grumman Corporation (Gottschalk, Tikkun)
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Tikkun A.S. Gottschalk on behalf of Northrop Grumman Corporation (Gottschalk, Tikkun)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Blue Ridge Industrial Support Co. answer due 9/25/2020; Dyna-Diggr LLC answer due 9/25/2020. Text of Order: ORDER: Defendants Dyna-Diggr, LLC & Blue Ridge Industrial Support Co.'s Consent Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED, and the deadline for defendants Dyna-Diggr, LLC and Blue Ridge Industrial Support Co. to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is EXTENDED through and including September 25, 2020. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 9/8/2020. (kkb)
September 8, 2020 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Blue Ridge Industrial Support Co., Dyna-Diggr LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Clarke, William). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WASCO LLC (Sullivan, Sean)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew R. Wagner on behalf of WASCO LLC (Wagner, Andrew)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Steven DeGeorge on behalf of WASCO LLC (DeGeorge, R.)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (ejb)
August 18, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(khm)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4625239), filed by WASCO LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Superior Court Order), #2 Exhibit B (Court of Appeals ruling), #3 Exhibit C (Court of Appeals Ruling, #4 Exhibit D (Draft Permit))(Sullivan, Sean) Modified text to change "against All Plaintiffs" to "against All Defendants" on 8/18/2020. NEF Regenerated. (ejb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WASCO LLC v. Northrop Grumman Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WMI II, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McGregor II, LLC
Represented By: Christian W. Habersaat
Represented By: Joel E. Antwi
Represented By: Kimberly Jill Kirk
Represented By: Amy Lyn Rickers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smokey Mountain Pallet, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen P. Agan
Represented By: George B. Hyler, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsonite LLC
Represented By: Christian W. Habersaat
Represented By: Joel E. Antwi
Represented By: Kimberly Jill Kirk
Represented By: Amy Lyn Rickers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Ridge Industrial Support Co.
Represented By: William Clarke
Represented By: Ann-Patton Hornthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNA Holdings LLC
Represented By: Robert D. Fox
Represented By: Stephen B. Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dyna-Diggr LLC
Represented By: William Clarke
Represented By: Ann-Patton Hornthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemtronics, Inc.
Represented By: Robert D. Fox
Represented By: Stephen B. Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrop Grumman Corporation
Represented By: Robert D. Mowrey
Represented By: E. Peyton Nunez
Represented By: Robert J. Deutsch
Represented By: Tikkun A.S. Gottschalk
Represented By: David Michael Meezan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gildan USA Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Charles Grover
Represented By: Marla Tun Reschly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WASCO LLC
Represented By: Sean Michael Sullivan
Represented By: Andrew R. Wagner
Represented By: R. Steven DeGeorge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?