Smith v. Saul
Plaintiff: Tara L. Smith
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv00271
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Andrew M. Saul served on 10/2/2020, answer due 12/1/2020. (hms)
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically to US Marshal for service as to Andrew M. Saul, US Attorney and US Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 USM 285 Forms) (hms)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 09/30/2020. (hms)
September 25, 2020 Case assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (hms)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tara L. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis) (Goins, Carol)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul, filed by Tara L. Smith.(Goins, Carol)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara L. Smith
Represented By: Carol L. Goins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?