Waldrup v. Wilde et al
Plaintiff: Robert A.D. Waldrup
Defendant: Anthony Wilde and Dawn MacMahan
Case Number: 1:2020cv00393
Filed: December 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Directing Full Payment be made from Prison Account of Robert A.D. Waldrup and directing correctional facility to transmit payments. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (hms)
February 16, 2021 Filing 9 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (Sealed - Court) by NCDPS on behalf of Robert A.D. Waldrup. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (hms)
February 10, 2021 Filing 8 Prisoner Admin Remedy Statement by Robert A.D. Waldrup. (Attachments: #1 Attachments, #2 Envelope) (hms)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Prisoner Trust Account Statement of Plaintiff. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (hms) Modified text on 2/2/2021 (rhf).
January 27, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT - 1983 Application IFP (Sealed - Participants) by Robert A.D. Waldrup. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (hms)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Plaintiff's Request for Additional Time to Pay Filing Fee in that Plaintiff has 10 days within which to comply with the Notice of Deficiency. Should the Plaintiff fail to do so, this action will be dismissed without prejudice and closed without further notice. Filing Fee due by 1/29/2021. Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 1/19/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(khm)
January 15, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Additional Time to Pay Filing Fee by Robert A.D. Waldrup. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ejb)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Clerk of Court on 12/28/2020. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (rhf)
December 28, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint. Neither the filing fee of $402.00 or application to proceed without payment of fees was submitted with your Complaint. Application or Fee due by 1/19/2021. (rhf)
December 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Anthony Wilde, Dawn MacMahan filed by Robert A.D. Waldrup. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rhf) Modified on 1/6/2021 to add additional defendant Dawn MacMahan. NEF Regenerated (ejb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waldrup v. Wilde et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Wilde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn MacMahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert A.D. Waldrup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?