Murphy v. Cleveland County, et al
Plaintiff: Dante Antonia Murphy
Defendant: Katie Swanson, Doug Bridges, Cleveland County Department of Social Services, Cleveland County Board of Commissioners and Cleveland County
Case Number: 1:2021cv00005
Filed: January 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Referring Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 ra
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting Defts' #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint. Doug Bridges, Cleveland County, Cleveland County Board of Commissioners, Cleveland County Department of Social Services, and Katie Swanson answer(s) due 3/31/2021. Signed by W. Carleton Metcalf on 2/24/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb) Modified docket text to add signature info on 2/25/2021. (maf)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Doug Bridges, Cleveland County, Cleveland County Board of Commissioners, Cleveland County Department of Social Services, Katie Swanson. (Webster, Stephanie). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Partial Filing Fee Received: $ 200.00, receipt number CHD063938 (js)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons Issued Electronically to US Marshal for service as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 USM-285s) (ejb)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing Fee Received: $ 200.00, receipt number (mailed to CLT). (thh)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE: proposed Summonses received on 1/19/2021 (pages pulled from Doc. #5 ); which will be issued and submitted to U.S. Marshals Service to serve process on Defts once $200 partial filing fee is paid pursuant to #6 Order. These proposed Summonses have also been placed in the Civil Summons Queue. (Restriction of this docket entry has been removed, text Modified, and additional attachment added on 1/20/2021: #1 Reference Sheet re: IFP Application - Granted in Part) (ejb). NEF Regenerated (ejb).
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting in part Pltf's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, and directing Pltf pay a $200.00 partial filing fee to Clerk of Court by 2/03/2021. FURTHER ORDERING that Pltf prepare summonses for Defts and submit summonses to Clerk, also by 2/03/2021; upon receipt of summons, Clerk is directed to deliver process to U.S. Marshals Service to serve process on Defts at U.S. Government expense; (see Order for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 1/20/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadline: Pltf's Partial Filing Fee of $200 due by 2/3/2021, as directed in #6 Order. (ejb)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dante Antonia Murphy of the attached UNISSUED "Summons in a Civil Action" by Dante Antonia Murphy. Defendant asserts documents were served on defendants via email and mail on 1/14/2021. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (maf)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of the attached "Dismissal and Notice of Rights" by Dante Antonia Murphy. Defendant asserts documents were served on defendants via email and mail on 1/14/2021. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (maf)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Self-Representation by Dante Antonia Murphy re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (hms)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dante Antonia Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (hms). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf. Modified text to correct Plaintiff's middle name on 1/5/2021 (hms).
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against County of Cleveland, Cleveland County Department of Social Services, Cleveland County Board of Commissioners, Doug Bridges, Katie Swanson with Jury Demand, filed by Dante Antonia Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (hms) Modified text to correct Plaintiff's middle name on 1/5/2021 (hms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy v. Cleveland County, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katie Swanson
Represented By: Stephanie H. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Bridges
Represented By: Stephanie H. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleveland County Department of Social Services
Represented By: Stephanie H. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleveland County Board of Commissioners
Represented By: Stephanie H. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleveland County
Represented By: Stephanie H. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dante Antonia Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?