Bailey v. Saul
Plaintiff: James Leland Bailey
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 1:2021cv00033
Filed: February 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically to US Marshal for service as to Andrew M. Saul, US Attorney and US Attorney General. (Attachment: #1 USM-285 Forms) (maf)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that the Plaintiff's #2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Plaintiff's counsel shall prepare summonses for all appropriate parties and submit to the Clerk within 7 days of the entry of this order. The United States Marshal shall serve process upon Defendant. (Summons due by 2/24/2021). Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 2/16/2021. (rhf)
February 10, 2021 Case assigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (hms)
February 10, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Leland Bailey. (Piemonte, George) NEF regenerated. Modified text on 2/10/2021 (hms).
February 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul, filed by James Leland Bailey.(Piemonte, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Leland Bailey
Represented By: George C. Piemonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?