Robinson v. Oaks et al
Plaintiff: Albert Robinson
Defendant: The David K. Oaks Personal Trust, Oaks K. David, David Keith Oaks, Five Oaks Investments, Inc., Section 23 Property Owner's Association, Inc., D. V. Rao, Section 23, Property Owner's Association, Inc., John Edward Spainhour, McAngus, Goudelock & Courie, PLLC and The Law Firm of David K. Oaks, P.A.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00123
Filed: April 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2021 Filing 32 Summons Issued Electronically as to Section 23, Property Owner's Association, Inc.; John Edward Spainhour; McAngus, Goudelock & Courie, PLLC; and D. V. Rao, NOTICE: Pro Se Plaintiff Albert Robinson shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents ( #30 First Amended Complaint) in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (ejb) NEF Regenerated on 6/25/2021 to Pltf Albert Robinson's new email address. (ejb).
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER that Pltf's #9 Motion for Final Summary Judgment is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS PREMATURE; Pltf's #14 Motion for the Court to Take Judicial Notice is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS PREMATURE; Defts David K. Oaks, P.A.'s and Five Oaks Investments, Inc.'s #22 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue is DENIED AS MOOT; and Deft Section 23 Property Owner's Association Inc.'s #28 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 6/25/2021. (ejb) NEF Regenerated on 6/25/2021 to Pltf Albert Robinson's new email address. (ejb)
June 25, 2021 Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf: #14 MOTION, #9 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (khm)
June 23, 2021 Filing 30 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Albert Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Appendix "A", #2 Appendix "B", #3 Appendix "C", #4 four proposed Summons, #5 Envelope) (ejb)
June 18, 2021 Filing 29 REPLY to Response re #14 MOTION by Albert Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope) (rhf)
June 18, 2021 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss by Section 23 Property Owner's Association, Inc.. Responses due by 7/2/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Appendix of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 4.A., #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 8.A., #13 Exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit 9.A., #15 Exhibit 9.B., #16 Exhibit 10, #17 Exhibit 10.A.) (Spainhour, John). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
June 17, 2021 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand and MOTION to Dismiss by Section 23 Property Owner's Association, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motions to Dismiss, #2 Appendix to Exhibits in Support of Motions to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 4.A., #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 8.A., #13 Exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit 9.B., #15 Exhibit 10, #16 Exhibit 10.A.)(Spainhour, John) Modified docket text on 6/18/2021. (maf)
June 15, 2021 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION by Plaintiff to take Judicial Notice by Section 23 Property Owner's Association, Inc.. Replies due by 6/22/2021 (Spainhour, John)
June 15, 2021 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION by Five Oaks Investments, Inc., The Law Firm of David K. Oaks, P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Oaks, David)
June 14, 2021 Filing 24 Appendix by Five Oaks Investments, Inc., The Law Firm of David K. Oaks, P.A.. Appendix re: #22 Motion to Dismiss, #23 Memorandum in Support of Motion (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix, #3 Appendix)(Oaks, David)
June 14, 2021 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Support re #22 MOTION to Dismiss by Five Oaks Investments, Inc., The Law Firm of David K. Oaks, P.A.. (Oaks, David)
June 14, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss by Five Oaks Investments, Inc., The Law Firm of David K. Oaks, P.A.. Responses due by 6/28/2021 (Oaks, David). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
June 10, 2021 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Albert Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rhf)
June 7, 2021 Filing 20 Appendix re #18 Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by Five Oaks Investments, Inc., The Law Firm of David K. Oaks, P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Oaks, David) Modified text on 6/10/2021. (khm)
June 7, 2021 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #9 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #14 MOTION by Section 23 Property Owner's Association, Inc.. Replies due by 6/14/2021 (Spainhour, John)
June 7, 2021 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #9 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Five Oaks Investments, Inc., The Law Firm of David K. Oaks, P.A.. Replies due by 6/14/2021 (Oaks, David)
June 7, 2021 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Five Oaks Investments, Inc., The Law Firm of David K. Oaks, P.A.. Replies due by 6/14/2021 (Oaks, David)
June 4, 2021 Filing 16 Request to Receive Electronic Notification by Albert Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rhf)
June 1, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Correct Address and request to receive copies via court ECF by Albert Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (hms)
June 1, 2021 Filing 14 Plaintiff's MOTION for the Court to Take Judicial Notice by Albert Robinson. Responses due by 6/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope) (hms) Modified on 6/7/2021 to remove reference of referral to Magistrate. NEF Regenerated. (maf)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, and the deadline for Defendant Section 23 Property Owner's Association, Inc. to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is EXTENDED through and including 6/17/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 5/26/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(khm)
May 26, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint,,, by Section 23 Property Owner's Association, Inc.. (Spainhour, John). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
May 26, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Section 23 Property Owner's Association, Inc. (Spainhour, John)
May 26, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Spainhour on behalf of Section 23 Property Owner's Association, Inc. (Spainhour, John)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: 1) The #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead is GRANTED IN PART and the deadline for Defendants David K. Oaks, P.A. and Five Oaks Investments, Inc. to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is EXTENDED through and including 6/14/2021; and 2) The Motion is DENIED AS PREMATURE as to Defendant David Keith Oaks. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 5/24/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (maf) Modified signature date on 5/25/2021 (rth).
May 24, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Final Summary Judgment by Albert Robinson. Responses due by 6/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Final Summary Judgment, #2 Plaintiff's List of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Final Summary Judgment, #3 Plaintiff's Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Motion, #4 Envelope) (rhf)
May 24, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by David Keith Oaks, Five Oaks Investments, Inc., and The Law Firm of David K. Oaks, P.A. (Oaks, David). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf. Modified filers on 5/25/2021. NEF regenerated. (maf)
May 24, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Law Firm of David K. Oaks, P.A. (Oaks, David) Modified filers on 5/25/2021. NEF Regenerated. (maf)
May 24, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Five Oaks Investments, Inc. (Oaks, David) Modified on 5/25/2021 to correct filing party. NEF Regenerated. (maf)
May 24, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by David Keith Oaks on behalf of Five Oaks Investments, Inc., David Keith Oaks, and The Law Firm of David K. Oaks, P.A. (Oaks, David) Modified on 5/25/2021 to add additional parties as filers. NEF Regenerated. (maf)
May 10, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Albert Robinson. Five Oaks Investments, Inc., Section 23 Property Owner's Association, Inc., The Law Firm of David K. Oaks, P.A., served on 5/6/2021, answers due 5/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (hms) NEF regenerated. Modified to fix filed date on 5/12/2021 (hms).
May 6, 2021 Partial Filing Fee Received: $ 2.00, receipt number CHD065391 (js)
May 5, 2021 Partial Filing Fee Received: $ 400.00, receipt number CHD065385 (js)
May 3, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued Conventionally as to All Defendants. (rhf)
April 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand, filed by Albert Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Appendix "B" & "D" In Support of Plaintiff's Original Complaint, #2 Appendix In Support of Plaintiff's Original Complaint, #3 Exhibit 0002, #4 Exhibit 0005, #5 Exhibit 0008, #6 Exhibit 00010, #7 Exhibit 0011, #8 Exhibit 0012, #9 Exhibit 0013, #10 Exhibit 00015, #11 Exhibit 0022, #12 Exhibit 0030, #13 Exhibit 0032, #14 Exhibit 0039, #15 Exhibit 0052, #16 Exhibit 0056, #17 Exhibit 0078, #18 Exhibit 0095, #19 Exhibit 0198, #20 Exhibit 0206, #21 Exhibit 0234, #22 Exhibit 0285, #23 Exhibit 0321, #24 Exhibit 0337, #25 Exhibit 0428, #26 Exhibit 0443, #27 Exhibit 0454c, #28 Exhibit 0469, #29 Cover Sheet, #30 Proposed Summons) (rhf) Modified texts on 4/30/2021 (rhf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Oaks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The David K. Oaks Personal Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oaks K. David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Keith Oaks
Represented By: David Keith Oaks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Five Oaks Investments, Inc.
Represented By: David Keith Oaks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Section 23 Property Owner's Association, Inc.
Represented By: John E. Spainhour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. V. Rao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Section 23, Property Owner's Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Edward Spainhour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McAngus, Goudelock & Courie, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Law Firm of David K. Oaks, P.A.
Represented By: David Keith Oaks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?