Frost et al v. AmSafe Commercial Products, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Estate of Shawna R. Mays, Estate of Tristan A. Mays, Kristina R Frost, Gary A Mays, Kristina Rene Frost and Gary Allen Mays
Defendant: AmSafe Commercial Products, Inc., Shield Restraint Systems, Inc., Transdigm Group, Inc. and AMSAFE, INC.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00156
Filed: June 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Referring Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support.Plaintiffs' Response due by 8/30/2021 (khm)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time Text of Order: Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: 10 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support by Kristina Rene Frost, Gary Allen Mays is GRANTED, and Plaintiffs' deadline is extended to August 30, 2021. So Ordered. Entered by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 8/6/2021. (eel)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support by Kristina Rene Frost, Gary Allen Mays. Responses due by 8/16/2021 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time) (Beeson, Emily). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER that the #19 "Notice of Withdrawal" filed by defense counsel Kelly Eisenlohr-Moul is DEEMED INEFFECTIVE. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 7/30/2021. (kby)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kristina Rene Frost, Gary Allen Mays (Beeson, Emily)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Kelly Eisenlohr-Moul by AmSafe Commercial Products, Inc., AmSafe, Inc., Shield Restraint Systems, Inc., TransDigm Group, Inc. (Eisenlohr-Moul, Kelly) **Deemed Innefective pursuant to #21 Order.** (kby).
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Lindsey J. Boyd for AmSafe Commercial Products, Inc., AmSafe, Inc., Shield Restraint Systems, Inc. and TransDigm Group, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF) Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 7/30/2021. (khm)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Lindsey J. Boyd Filing fee $ 288, receipt number 0419-5140721. by AmSafe Commercial Products, Inc., AmSafe, Inc., Shield Restraint Systems, Inc., TransDigm Group, Inc.. (Eisenlohr-Moul, Kelly). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice to Lindsey J. Boyd: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF Account #Application Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 8/6/2021. (khm)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Admits H. Toby Schisler to practice pro hac vice before the Court in this matter while associated with local counsel, for AmSafe Commercial Products, Inc., AmSafe, Inc., Shield Restraint Systems, Inc., TransDigm Group, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 07/29/2021. (hms)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to H. Toby Schisler Filing fee $ 288, receipt number 0419-5138981. by AmSafe Commercial Products, Inc., AmSafe, Inc., Shield Restraint Systems, Inc., TransDigm Group, Inc.. (Eisenlohr-Moul, Kelly). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice to H. Toby Schisler: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF Account #Application Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 8/5/2021. (hms)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Admits Ana L. Zabalgoitia to practice pro hac vice before the Court in this matter for Kristina Rene Frost and Gary Allen Mays (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 7/22/2021. (hms)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Admits Marion Reilly, to practice pro hac vice before the Court in this matter for Kristina Rene Frost and Gary Allen Mays (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 7/22/2021. (hms)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice to Ana L. Zabalgoitia: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF Account #Application Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 7/29/2021. (hms)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice to Marion M. Reilly: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF Account #Application Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 7/29/2021. (hms)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Ana L. Zabalgoitia Filing fee $ 288, receipt number 0419-5127961. by Kristina Rene Frost, Gary Allen Mays. (Beeson, Emily). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Marion M. Reilly Filing fee $ 288, receipt number 0419-5127838. by Kristina Rene Frost, Gary Allen Mays. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" Jurisdictions Admitted) (Beeson, Emily). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support by AmSafe Commercial Products, Inc., AmSafe, Inc., Shield Restraint Systems, Inc., TransDigm Group, Inc.. Responses due by 7/30/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1--Michigan Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2--Ohio Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3--Ohio Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4--Opinion and Order, #5 Exhibit 5--GM's Motion to Dismiss, #6 Exhibit 6--Response in Opposition to GM's Motion to Dismiss, #7 Exhibit 7--Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration, #8 Exhibit 8--Notice of Nonsuit) (Eisenlohr-Moul, Kelly)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kristina Rene Frost, Gary Allen Mays. AmSafe Commercial Products, Inc. served on 6/24/2021, answer due 7/15/2021. (Beeson, Emily)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons Reissued Electronically as to AmSafe Commercial Products, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. (ejb)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against AmSafe Commercial Products, Inc., AmSafe, Inc., Shield Restraint Systems, Inc., TransDigm Group, Inc., filed by Kristina Rene Frost, Gary Allen Mays.(Beeson, Emily)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kristina Rene Frost, Gary Allen Mays. Transdigm Group, Inc. served on 6/16/2021, answer due 7/7/2021. (Beeson, Emily)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kristina Rene Frost, Gary Allen Mays. Shield Restraint Systems, Inc. served on 6/15/2021, answer due 7/7/2021. (Beeson, Emily) Modified service and answer due date on 6/17/2021 (kby).
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Kristina Rene Frost, Gary Allen Mays. AMSAFE, INC. served on 6/15/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. (Beeson, Emily)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Kristina Rene Frost, Gary Allen Mays. AmSafe Commercial Products, Inc. served on 6/15/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. (Beeson, Emily)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to AMSAFE, INC., AmSafe Commercial Products, Inc., Shield Restraint Systems, Inc., Transdigm Group, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (rhf)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (rhf)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0419-5072931), filed by Kristina Rene Frost, and Gary Allen Mays, individually and as Co-Personal Representatives of the Estates of Shawna R. Mays, and Tristan A. Mays, Deceased. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Beeson, Emily) Modified text on 6/14/2021 (ejb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frost et al v. AmSafe Commercial Products, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Shawna R. Mays
Represented By: Emily Jeanette Beeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Tristan A. Mays
Represented By: Emily Jeanette Beeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristina R Frost
Represented By: Emily Jeanette Beeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary A Mays
Represented By: Emily Jeanette Beeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristina Rene Frost
Represented By: Ana Luisa Zabalgoitia
Represented By: Marion Magdalene Reilly
Represented By: Emily Jeanette Beeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Allen Mays
Represented By: Ana Luisa Zabalgoitia
Represented By: Marion Magdalene Reilly
Represented By: Emily Jeanette Beeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmSafe Commercial Products, Inc.
Represented By: H. Toby Schisler
Represented By: Kelly Elisabeth Eisenlohr-Moul
Represented By: Lindsey J. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shield Restraint Systems, Inc.
Represented By: H. Toby Schisler
Represented By: Kelly Elisabeth Eisenlohr-Moul
Represented By: Lindsey J. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transdigm Group, Inc.
Represented By: H. Toby Schisler
Represented By: Kelly Elisabeth Eisenlohr-Moul
Represented By: Lindsey J. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMSAFE, INC.
Represented By: H. Toby Schisler
Represented By: Kelly Elisabeth Eisenlohr-Moul
Represented By: Lindsey J. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?