The Village Tavern, Inc. v. Catbird Hospitality, LLC et al
Plaintiff: The Village Tavern, Inc.
Defendant: Catbird Hospitality, LLC and Jason Samuel Cancilla
Case Number: 1:2021cv00228
Filed: August 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2021 Filing 7 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Jason Samuel Cancilla, Catbird Hospitality, LLC. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (khm)
October 15, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Entry of Default by The Village Tavern, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Motion for Entry of Default, #2 Affidavit SCRA Declaration, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Entry of Default) (Archer, Chad)
September 20, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by the Jackson County Sheriff's Office. Catbird Hospitality, LLC served on 9/16/2021, answer due 10/7/2021. Jason Samuel Cancilla served on 9/16/2021, answer due 10/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned as to Catbird Hospitality, LLC, #2 Summons Returned as to Jason Cancilla, #3 Envelope) (maf)
August 31, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Village Tavern, Inc. (Archer, Chad)
August 20, 2021 Filing 3 REPORT on the Filing of an action regarding trademark numbers contained in complaint. (hms) (Main Document 3 replaced to correct report on 8/25/2021) NEF regenerated (hms).
August 20, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Jason Samuel Cancilla, Catbird Hospitality, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (hms)
August 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jason Samuel Cancilla, Catbird Hospitality, LLC with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0419-5173490), filed by The Village Tavern, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Archer, Chad) Modified text on 8/19/2021 (hms). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/20/2021: #2 Trademark Document) (hms).
August 19, 2021 Case assigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (hms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Village Tavern, Inc. v. Catbird Hospitality, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Village Tavern, Inc.
Represented By: Chad Alan Archer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catbird Hospitality, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Samuel Cancilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?