WNC Citizens for Equality, Inc. v. City of Asheville et al
Plaintiff: WNC Citizens for Equality, Inc.
Defendant: City of Asheville, Debra Campbell, The Asheville City Schools Foundation, Copland Rudolph and Copland Arnold Rudolph
Case Number: 1:2021cv00310
Filed: October 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Referring Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER that the Consent Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants The Asheville City Schools Foundation and Copeland Arnold Rudolph to Answer or Otherwise Respond Doc. #11 ; and the Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by the City of Asheville and Debra Campbell Doc. #12 are GRANTED IN PART, and the deadline for all Defendants to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is EXTENDED through and including 1/18/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 12/2/2021. (rhf)
December 2, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Debra Campbell, City of Asheville. (Edgerton, Eric). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
December 2, 2021 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Copland Arnold Rudolph, The Asheville City Schools Foundation. Responses due by 12/16/2021 (Rockoff, Sabrina). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
November 10, 2021 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Copland Arnold Rudolph, The Asheville City Schools Foundation. Responses due by 11/24/2021 (Rockoff, Sabrina). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, . Debra Campbell answer due 12/3/2021; City of Asheville answer due 12/3/2021. Text of Order: ORDER: Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is GRANTED, and the deadline for Defendants the City of Asheville and Debra Campbell to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is EXTENDED by twenty-one (21) days, through and including December 3, 2021. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 11/10/2021. (kkb)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Copland Arnold Rudolph answer due 12/3/2021; The Asheville City Schools Foundation answer due 12/3/2021. Text of Order: ORDER: The Consent Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants The Asheville City Schools Foundation and Copeland Arnold Rudolph to Answer or Otherwise Respond is GRANTED, and the deadline for Defendants The Asheville City Schools Foundation and Copeland Arnold Rudolph to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is EXTENDED by twenty-one (21) days, through and including December 3, 2021. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 11/10/2021. (kkb)
November 9, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Debra Campbell, City of Asheville. (Edgerton, Eric). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added James F. Peterson for WNC Citizens for Equality, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 10/25/2021. (rhf)
October 25, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WNC Citizens for Equality, Inc.. Copland Arnold Rudolph served on 10/22/2021, answer due 11/12/2021. (Smith, Ruth)
October 25, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WNC Citizens for Equality, Inc.. City of Asheville served on 10/22/2021, answer due 11/12/2021. (Smith, Ruth)
October 25, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WNC Citizens for Equality, Inc.. Debra Campbell served on 10/22/2021, answer due 11/12/2021. (Smith, Ruth)
October 25, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WNC Citizens for Equality, Inc.. The Asheville City Schools Foundation served on 10/22/2021, answer due 11/12/2021. (Smith, Ruth)
October 25, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to James F. Peterson Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5283253. by WNC Citizens for Equality, Inc.. (Smith, Ruth). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
October 25, 2021 Notice to James F. Peterson: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 11/1/2021. (rhf)
October 19, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Debra Campbell, City of Asheville, Copland Rudolph, The Asheville City Schools Foundation. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (rhf) (Main Document 2 replaced to correct summons, on 10/19/2021) (hms). NEF regenerated.
October 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5274139), filed by WNC Citizens for Equality. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Smith, Ruth)
October 19, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (rhf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WNC Citizens for Equality, Inc. v. City of Asheville et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WNC Citizens for Equality, Inc.
Represented By: Ruth C. Smith
Represented By: James F. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Asheville
Represented By: Eric P. Edgerton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Campbell
Represented By: Eric P. Edgerton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Asheville City Schools Foundation
Represented By: Sabrina P. Rockoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Copland Rudolph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Copland Arnold Rudolph
Represented By: Sabrina P. Rockoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?