Swan-Sullivan v. Eat Drink Here L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Uniya Swan-Sullivan
Defendant: Eat Drink Here L.L.C. and Charles A. Hodge doing business as Sovereign Remedies
Case Number: 1:2021cv00314
Filed: October 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Referring Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Uniya Swan-Sullivan. Eat Drink Here L.L.C. served on 12/15/2021, answer due 1/5/2022. (Ghosh, Narendra)
December 20, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Uniya Swan-Sullivan. Charles A. Hodge served on 12/15/2021, answer due 1/5/2022. (Ghosh, Narendra)
November 2, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Consent *of Joshua Fleenor by Uniya Swan-Sullivan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Notice of Consent Form)(Ghosh, Narendra) Modified *text on 11/3/2021 (ejb).
October 28, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Consent *of Rachael Bennett by Uniya Swan-Sullivan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Notice of Consent Form)(Ghosh, Narendra) Modified *text on 11/3/2021 (ejb).
October 27, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Consent *of Uniya Swan-Sullivan by Uniya Swan-Sullivan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Notice of Consent Form)(Ghosh, Narendra) Modified *text on 11/3/2021 (ejb).
October 25, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Eat Drink Here L.L.C., Charles A. Hodge. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (rhf)
October 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Eat Drink Here L.L.C., Charles A. Hodge with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5280370), filed by Uniya Swan-Sullivan.(Ghosh, Narendra)
October 22, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (hms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swan-Sullivan v. Eat Drink Here L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uniya Swan-Sullivan
Represented By: Narendra Kumar Ghosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eat Drink Here L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles A. Hodge doing business as Sovereign Remedies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?