Seay v. Fulcher's Red Fox Stables, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Clant M. Seay
Defendant: Garland Christopher Fulcher, ll, Fulcher's Red Fox Stables, LLC, Jesse Ryan Cahoon, Gregory Wayne Mooningham and Chaz Fulcher, ll
Case Number: 1:2021cv00344
Filed: November 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER that the #16 Joint Motion for Early Discovery is GRANTED as follows:(1.) The parties are GRANTED LEAVE to issue a subpoena pursuant to Rule 45 of the F.R.Cv.P. to Dean Johnson d/b/a Dean Johnson Video seeking the production of the complete unedited raw video of "Youth 12-17 Championship" class made on Saturday, 10/9/2021 for Report TV at the N.C. Championship Horse Show held in the McGough Arena at the WNC Ag Center, Buncombe County, N.C ("Subpoena"). (2.) This Order does not preclude the filing of any objections to the Subpoena by Dean Johnson d/b/a Dean Johnson Video or any other third party with appropriate standing. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 1/21/2022. (ejb)
January 21, 2022 Filing 16 Joint MOTION for Discovery by Clant M. Seay. Responses due by 2/4/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena, #2 Exhibit Notice of Subpoena) (Tate, Douglas). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
January 18, 2022 Filing 15 Joint CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Tate, Douglas)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time To Submit CIAC/Joint Stipulation CIAC Report due by 1/18/2022. Text of Order: ORDER: The Motion for Extension of Time to File CIAC and Joint Stipulation is GRANTED, and the deadline for the parties to file their Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference is EXTENDED through and including January 18, 2022. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 1/14/2022. (kkb)
January 13, 2022 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time To Submit CIAC/Joint Stipulation by Clant M. Seay. Responses due by 1/27/2022 (Tate, Douglas). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
December 23, 2021 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 1/13/2022. (maf)
December 22, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, with Jury Demand by Jesse Ryan Cahoon, Garland Christopher Fulcher, ll, Fulcher's Red Fox Stables, LLC, Gregory Wayne Mooningham.(Racine, Russell)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying Pltf's Attorney Douglas J. Tate's #11 Motion for Pltf Clant M. Seay Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 12/15/2021. (Pltf Clant M. Seay and Attorney Douglas J. Tate served via NEF) (ejb)
December 14, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Clant M. Seay Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5359108. by Clant M. Seay. (Tate, Douglas). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf. NEF Regenerated to Atty Douglas J. Tate on 12/15/2021 (ejb).
December 14, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas J. Tate on behalf of Clant M. Seay (Tate, Douglas) NEF Regenerated to Atty Douglas J. Tate on 12/15/2021. (ejb)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that Pltf's #8 Emergency Motion for Early-Enforceable Discovery from a Non-Party pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) Discovery Conference is DENIED. (See Order for further details.) Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 12/14/2021. (ejb)
December 10, 2021 Filing 8 Second Pro Se EMERGENCY MOTION for Early-Enforceable Discovery from a Non-Party pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) Discovery Conference by Clant M. Seay. Responses due by 12/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Subpoena) (hms) Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf. Modified text on 12/10/2021 (hms). NEF regenerated.
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that: the "Motion to Allow Plaintiff to Use the ECF Electronic Filing System for Filing and Service of Documents" (Doc. #5 ) is DENIED; and "Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Early-Enforceable Discovery from a Non-Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) Discovery Conference (Doc. #6 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 12/6/2021. (ejb)
December 6, 2021 Filing Fee Received: $ 402, receipt number CHD068748 (tlj)
December 3, 2021 Filing 6 Pro Se EMERGENCY MOTION for Early-Enforceable Discovery from a Non-Party pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) Discovery Conference by Clant M. Seay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Proposed Subpoena, #2 Exhibit 2 Notice of Subpoena, #3 Proposed Order) (ejb). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
December 2, 2021 Filing 5 Pro Se MOTION to Allow Plaintiff to use the ECF Electronic Filing System for Filing and Service of Documents by Clant M. Seay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order) (ejb). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
November 24, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued Conventionally as to Jesse Ryan Cahoon, Garland Christopher Fulcher, ll, Fulcher's Red Fox Stables, LLC, Gregory Wayne Mooningham, and handed to Pltf Clant M. Seay at the public counter. (ejb)
November 24, 2021 Filing 3 Request to Receive Electronic Notification by Clant M. Seay. (ejb)
November 24, 2021 Filing 2 Continuation of Exhibits to #1 Complaint by Clant M. Seay: Exhibit 46, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 47, #2 Exhibit 48, #3 Exhibit 49, #4 Exhibit 50, #5 Exhibit 51, #6 Exhibit 52, #7 Exhibit 53, #8 Exhibit 54, #9 Exhibit 55, #10 Exhibit 56, #11 Exhibit 57, #12 Exhibit 58, #13 Exhibit 59, #14 Exhibit 60, #15 Exhibit 61, #16 Exhibit 62, #17 Exhibit 63, #18 Exhibit 64, #19 Exhibit 65, #20 Exhibit 66, #21 Exhibit 67, #22 Exhibit 68, #23 Exhibit 69, #24 Exhibit 70, #25 Exhibit 71, #26 Exhibit 72, #27 Exhibit 73, #28 Exhibit 74, #29 Exhibit 75, #30 Exhibit 76, #31 Exhibit 77, #32 Exhibit 78, #33 Exhibit 79, #34 Exhibit 80, #35 Exhibit 81, #36 Exhibit 82, #37 Exhibit 83, #38 Exhibit 84, #39 Exhibit 85, #40 Exhibit 86, #41 Exhibit 87, #42 Exhibit 88, #43 Exhibit 89, #44 Exhibit 90, #45 Exhibit 91, #46 Exhibit 92, #47 Exhibit 93, #48 Civil Cover Sheet) (ejb)
November 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fulcher's Red Fox Stables, LLC, Jesse Ryan Cahoon, Gregory Wayne Mooningham, Garland Christopher Fulcher, ll, with Jury Demand ($ 402 Filing fee received and forwarded to Charlotte to receipt), filed by Clant M. Seay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39 A, #40 Exhibit 39 B, #41 Exhibit 39 C, #42 Exhibit 39 D, #43 Exhibit 39 E, #44 Exhibit 40, #45 Exhibit 41, #46 Exhibit 42, #47 Exhibit 43, #48 Exhibit 44, #49 Exhibit 45) ***NOTE: Continuation of Exhibits found in docket entry #2 .*** (ejb)
November 24, 2021 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Case Assignment Packet. The document was served conventionally at case filing upon Pltf Clant M. Seay. (ejb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seay v. Fulcher's Red Fox Stables, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garland Christopher Fulcher, ll
Represented By: Russell Marcoux Racine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fulcher's Red Fox Stables, LLC
Represented By: Russell Marcoux Racine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Ryan Cahoon
Represented By: Russell Marcoux Racine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Wayne Mooningham
Represented By: Russell Marcoux Racine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chaz Fulcher, ll
Represented By: Russell Marcoux Racine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clant M. Seay
Represented By: Douglas J. Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?