Osmon v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Erin Osmon
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2021cv00353
Filed: December 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
Presiding Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2271 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2022 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss by United States of America. (Beck, Gill)
February 16, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss by United States of America. Responses due by 3/2/2022 (Beck, Gill). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss Replies due by 3/2/2022 Text of Order: ORDER: Defendant United States' Motion for Extension of Time to Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED, and the deadline for the United States to reply is EXTENDED through and including March 2, 2022. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 2/16/2022. (kkb)
February 9, 2022 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss by Erin Osmon. Replies due by 2/16/2022 (Corbett, Jonathan)
January 26, 2022 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Kevin Frederick)(Beck, Gill)
January 26, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by United States of America. Responses due by 2/9/2022 (Beck, Gill). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
December 16, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to United States of America, US Attorney and US Attorney General. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(js)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Jonathan Corbett is ADMITTED to practice pro hac vice on behalf of Erin Osmon while associated with local counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 12/15/2021. (maf)
December 14, 2021 #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jonathan Corbett referred to W. Carleton Metcalf. (maf)
December 14, 2021 Case *1:21-cv-00353 assigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(js) Modified *text on 12/14/2021. NEF Regenerated (ejb).
December 14, 2021 NOTICE: Case was filed in wrong division *CHARLOTTE. Case has been copied from 3:21-cv-00662 *to ASHEVILLE DIVISION case number 1:21-cv-00353-MR-WCM*. Please use 1:21-cv-00353-MR-WCM* for all future pleadings. (js) Modified *text* on 12/14/2021. NEF Regenerated (ejb).
December 13, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jonathan Corbett Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5357122. by Erin Osmon. (Gambale, Matthew)
December 13, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Ryan Gambale on behalf of Erin Osmon (Gambale, Matthew)
December 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5357111), filed by Erin Osmon. (Attachments: #1 *Civil Cover Sheet)(Gambale, Matthew) Modified *text on 12/14/2021 (ejb).
December 13, 2021 ***NOTE: This case has now been reassigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger as of 12/14/2021. DISREGARD this previously docketed entry*** Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (js) Modified ***Text*** on 12/14/2021. NEF Regenerated (ejb).
December 13, 2021 ***NOTE: This case has now been reassigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf as of 12/14/2021. DISREGARD this previously docketed entry*** Case assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(js) Modified ***Text*** on 12/14/2021. NEF Regenerated (ejb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Osmon v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Osmon
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Gambale
Represented By: Jonathan Corbett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Gill Paul Beck, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?