Birchfield v. Kellex Corporation, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jimmy Birchfield
Defendant: Kellex Corporation, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00362
Filed: December 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: 3 days. Discovery due by 11/8/2022. Motions due by 12/8/2022. Mediator Designation deadline set for 3/17/2022. Mediation deadline set for 11/18/2022. Jury Trial set for 5/8/2023 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1, 100 Otis St, Asheville, NC 28801 before Chief Judge Martin Reidinger. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 2/24/2022. (kby)
February 24, 2022 Minute Entry: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held before Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Plaintiffs attorney: Mark Burts. Defendants attorney: Jonathan Yarbrough. An initial pretrial conference was held by video on February 24, 2022 with Mark Burts participating on behalf of Plaintiff Jimmy Birchfield and Jonathan Yarbrough participating on behalf of Defendant Kellex Corporation, Inc. A pretrial order will issue. (MMC)
February 15, 2022 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 2/24/2022 at 9:30 a.m. by Teams videoconference before Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. The Clerk will contact counsel separately with a hearing link. (maf)
February 11, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Yarbrough, Jonathan)
January 26, 2022 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 2/16/2022. (khm)
January 25, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jill A. Evert on behalf of Kellex Corporation, Inc. (Evert, Jill)
January 25, 2022 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kellex Corporation, Inc. (Yarbrough, Jonathan)
January 25, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Kellex Corporation, Inc..(Yarbrough, Jonathan)
January 12, 2022 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Jimmy Birchfield. Kellex Corporation, Inc. served on 1/4/2022, answer due 1/25/2022. (Burts, Mark)
December 30, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Kellex Corporation, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (rhf)
December 29, 2021 Case assigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (rhf)
December 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kellex Corporation, Inc. with Jury Demand, filed by Jimmy Birchfield. (Attachments: #1 Verification)(Burts, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Birchfield v. Kellex Corporation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Birchfield
Represented By: Mark Anthony Burts, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellex Corporation, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan W. Yarbrough
Represented By: Jill A. Evert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?