City of Brevard, North Carolina v. HCA Healthcare, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: City of Brevard, North Carolina and Madison County
Defendant: ANC Healthcare, Inc., HCA Healthcare, Inc., HCA Management Services, LP, HCA, Inc., MH Master Holdings, LLLP, MH Hospital Manager, LLC, MH Mission Hospital, LLLP, Mission Health System, Inc. and Mission Hospital, Inc.
Consolidated Plaintiff: Buncombe County, North Carolina and City of Asheville, North Carolina
Interested Party: State of NC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00114
Filed: June 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Response to Amicus Brief by ANC Healthcare, Inc., HCA Healthcare, Inc., HCA Management Services, LP, HCA, Inc., MH Hospital Manager, LLC, MH Master Holdings, LLLP, MH Mission Hospital, LLLP, Mission Hospital, Inc.. Responses due by 12/6/2022 (Attachments: #1 Response to Amicus Brief of State of NC) (Hawisher, David)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #50 , #51 , #52 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Brendan P. Glackin, Daniel E. Seltz, and Dean M. Harvey for Buncombe County, North Carolina and City of Asheville, North Carolina. (Pro Hac Vice Attorneys served via NEF) Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 11/11/2022. (khm)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice to Brendan P. Glackin: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 11/21/2022. (khm)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice to Daniel E. Seltz: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 11/21/2022. (khm)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice to Dean M. Harvey: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 11/21/2022. (khm)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiffs by State of NC. Responses due by 11/22/2022 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Amicus Brief in support of Plaintiffs) (Lucas, Tiffany)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany Y. Lucas on behalf of State of NC (Lucas, Tiffany)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 REPLY to Response to Motion re #45 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by HCA Healthcare, Inc., HCA Management Services, LP, HCA, Inc., MH Hospital Manager, LLC, MH Master Holdings, LLLP, MH Mission Hospital, LLLP. (Ellis, Abram)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 REPLY to Response to Motion re #46 MOTION to Dismiss by ANC Healthcare, Inc., Mission Hospital, Inc.. (Lumsden, Dana)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5816338. by Buncombe County, North Carolina, City of Asheville, North Carolina, City of Brevard, North Carolina. (Hunter, Robert)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Daniel E. Seltz Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5816333. by Buncombe County, North Carolina, City of Asheville, North Carolina, City of Brevard, North Carolina. (Hunter, Robert)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Brendan P. Glackin Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5816305. by Buncombe County, North Carolina, City of Asheville, North Carolina, City of Brevard, North Carolina. (Hunter, Robert)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 RESPONSE in Opposition re #46 MOTION to Dismiss by Buncombe County, North Carolina, City of Asheville, North Carolina, City of Brevard, North Carolina, Madison County. Replies due by 10/21/2022 (Hunter, Robert)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 RESPONSE in Opposition re #45 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Buncombe County, North Carolina, City of Asheville, North Carolina, City of Brevard, North Carolina, Madison County. Replies due by 10/21/2022 (Hunter, Robert)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf no longer assigned to case due to a conflict. (thh)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Reset Response Deadlines automatically set by the ECF System to the Response Deadlines previously set in the #42 Order and Initial Case Management Plan, as to #45 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, and #46 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 10/14/2022. (ejb)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MEMORANDUM in Support re #46 MOTION to Dismiss by ANC Healthcare, Inc., Mission Hospital, Inc.. (Lumsden, Dana)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION to Dismiss by ANC Healthcare, Inc., Mission Hospital, Inc.. Responses due by *10/14/2022 (Lumsden, Dana). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf. Modified *text on 9/12/2022 to correct date Responses are due. NEF Regenerated (ejb).
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by HCA Healthcare, Inc., HCA Management Services, LP, HCA, Inc., MH Hospital Manager, LLC, MH Master Holdings, LLLP, MH Mission Hospital, LLLP. Responses due by *10/14/2022 (Attachments: #1 HCA Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss) (Ellis, Abram). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf. Modified *text on 9/12/2022 to correct date Responses are due. NEF Regenerated (ejb).
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Ann-Patton Hornthal on behalf of HCA Healthcare, Inc., HCA Management Services, LP, HCA, Inc., MH Hospital Manager, LLC, MH Master Holdings, LLLP, MH Mission Hospital, LLLP (Hornthal, Ann-Patton)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 *CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against All *Defendants with Jury Demand ( *Additional Filing fee paid in error, receipt number ANCWDC-5706759, $ 402 to be refunded to Attorney Hunter), filed by City of Asheville, North Carolina, Buncombe County, North Carolina, City of Brevard, North Carolina, *Madison County, North Carolina. (Hunter, Robert) Modified *text on 8/23/2022. NEF Regenerated (ejb).
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER AND INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: Pltfs and Defts' Joint MOTION to Consolidate this Case with 1:22cv00147 and for Entry of Initial Case Management Order [Doc. #41 , filed in 1:22-cv-00114-MR-WCM] is GRANTED, and Case Nos. 1:22-cv-00114-MR-WCM and 1:22-cv-00147-MR-WCM are hereby CONSOLIDATED for all purposes up to and including trial before the undersigned. Case No. 1:22-cv-00114-MR-WCM is designated as the lead case, and Case No. 1:22-cv-00147 shall be administratively closed. Pursuant to Civil LR 42.1, all future pleadings will be docketed and filed in the designated lead case only. FURTHER ORDERED that any counsel who has been admitted pro hac vice in 1:22-cv-00114-MR-WCM and 1:22-cv-00147-MR-WCM shall be admitted pro hac vice in the designated lead case, 1:22-cv-00114-MR-WCM, and any counsel not so admitted may file an application to be admitted pro hac vice in the designated lead case. FURTHER ORDERED that parties shall follow the following initial case management plan to govern the filing of Pltfs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Defts' anticipated response: (1) All papers filed in this action shall be filed under the designated lead case 1:22-cv-00114-MR-WCM, and must bear the following case name: In re Mission Health Antitrust Litigation; (2) Pltfs shall file a Consolidated Class Action Complaint by 8/19/2022; (3) Pltfs' filing of the Consolidated Complaint shall not prejudice their ability to amend as of course under F.R.Cv.P. 15(a)(1); (4) Defts shall respond to the Consolidated Complaint, including by filing any motion(s) pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. 12, by 9/9/2022; (5) Pltfs' opposition(s) to any such motion(s) filed pursuant to Rule 12 shall be filed by 10/14/2022; (6) Any reply in support of Defts' motion(s) shall be filed by 11/4/2022; (7) Defts' brief(s) in support of motion(s) filed pursuant to Rule 12 and Pltfs' brief(s) in opposition to Defts' motion(s) shall each not exceed 25 pages. Defts' reply brief(s) shall each not exceed 10 pages. Briefs must be double spaced and in at least 14 point type. Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 8/6/2022. (ejb)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Joint MOTION to Consolidate This Case with 1:22cv00147 by City of Brevard, North Carolina. Responses due by 8/18/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Case Management Order) (Hunter, Robert). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #35 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Laurel Fresquez for HCA Healthcare, Inc.; HCA Management Services, LP; HCA, Inc.; MH Hospital Manager, LLC; MH Master Holdings, LLLP; and MH Mission Hospital, LLLP (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 6/29/2022. (ejb)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added John Robinson for HCA Healthcare, Inc.; HCA Management Services, LP; HCA, Inc.; MH Hospital Manager, LLC; MH Master Holdings, LLLP; and MH Mission Hospital, LLLP (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 6/29/2022. (ejb)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Sara Y. Razi for HCA Healthcare, Inc.; HCA Management Services, LP; HCA, Inc.; MH Hospital Manager, LLC; MH Master Holdings, LLLP; and MH Mission Hospital, LLLP (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 6/29/2022. (ejb)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Abram J. Ellis for HCA Healthcare, Inc.; HCA Management Services, LP; HCA, Inc.; MH Hospital Manager, LLC; MH Master Holdings, LLLP; and MH Mission Hospital, LLLP (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 6/29/2022. (ejb)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice to Attorney Laurel Fresquez: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF). Deadline by 7/6/2022. (ejb)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice to Attorney Abram J. Ellis: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF). Deadline by 7/6/2022. (ejb)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice to Attorney Sara Y. Razi: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF). Deadline by 7/6/2022. (ejb)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice to Attorney John Robinson: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF). Deadline by 7/6/2022. (ejb)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip T. Jackson on behalf of HCA Healthcare, Inc., HCA Management Services, LP, HCA, Inc., MH Hospital Manager, LLC, MH Master Holdings, LLLP, MH Mission Hospital, LLLP (Jackson, Phillip)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Laurel Fresquez Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5635450. by HCA Healthcare, Inc., HCA Management Services, LP, HCA, Inc., MH Hospital Manager, LLC, MH Master Holdings, LLLP, MH Mission Hospital, LLLP. (Hawisher, David). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to John Robinson Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5635442. by HCA Healthcare, Inc., HCA Management Services, LP, HCA, Inc., MH Hospital Manager, LLC, MH Master Holdings, LLLP, MH Mission Hospital, LLLP. (Hawisher, David). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Sara Y. Razi Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5635437. by HCA Healthcare, Inc., HCA Management Services, LP, HCA, Inc., MH Hospital Manager, LLC, MH Master Holdings, LLLP, MH Mission Hospital, LLLP. (Hawisher, David). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Abram J. Ellis Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5635432. by HCA Healthcare, Inc., HCA Management Services, LP, HCA, Inc., MH Hospital Manager, LLC, MH Master Holdings, LLLP, MH Mission Hospital, LLLP. (Hawisher, David). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MH Hospital Manager, LLC (Hawisher, David)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MH Master Holdings, LLLP (Hawisher, David)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MH Mission Hospital, LLLP (Hawisher, David)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HCA Management Services, LP (Hawisher, David)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HCA, Inc. (Hawisher, David)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HCA Healthcare, Inc. (Hawisher, David)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by David Chase Hawisher on behalf of HCA Healthcare, Inc., HCA Management Services, LP, HCA, Inc., MH Hospital Manager, LLC, MH Master Holdings, LLLP, MH Mission Hospital, LLLP (Hawisher, David)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Paul H. Saint-Antoine for ANC Healthcare, Inc., and Mission Hospital, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 6/22/2022. (ejb)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Alison M. Agnew for ANC Healthcare, Inc., and Mission Hospital, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 6/22/2022. (ejb)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Kenneth M. Vorrasi for ANC Healthcare, Inc., and Mission Hospital, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 6/22/2022. (ejb)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice to Attorney Kenneth M. Vorrasi: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF.) Deadline by 6/29/2022. (ejb)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice to Attorney Alison M. Agnew: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF.) Deadline by 6/29/2022. (ejb)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice to Attorney Paul H. Saint-Antoine: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF.) Deadline by 6/29/2022. (ejb)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Anna Bryce Hobson on behalf of ANC Healthcare, Inc., Mission Hospital, Inc. (Hobson, Anna Bryce)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Alison M. Agnew Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5622099. by ANC Healthcare, Inc., Mission Hospital, Inc.. (Lumsden, Dana). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Paul H. Saint-Antoine Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5622095. by ANC Healthcare, Inc., Mission Hospital, Inc.. (Lumsden, Dana). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Kenneth M. Vorrasi Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5622080. by ANC Healthcare, Inc., Mission Hospital, Inc.. (Lumsden, Dana). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mission Hospital, Inc. (Lumsden, Dana)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ANC Healthcare, Inc. (Lumsden, Dana)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Todt on behalf of ANC Healthcare, Inc., Mission Hospital, Inc. (Todt, Jonathan)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Dana C. Lumsden on behalf of ANC Healthcare, Inc., Mission Hospital, Inc. (Lumsden, Dana)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Daniel J. Walker is granted pro hac vice admission to the bar of this Court. (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 6/17/2022. (hms)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Jacob M. Polakoff is granted pro hac vice admission to the bar of this Court. (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 6/17/2022. (hms)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Robert E. Litan is granted pro hac vice admission to the bar of this Court. (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 6/17/2022. (hms)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Eric L. Cramer is granted pro hac vice admission to the bar of this Court. (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 6/17/2022. (hms) (Main Document 10 replaced to include correct Order on 6/17/2022) (hms) NEF regenerated.
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice to Jacob M. Polakoff: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 6/24/2022. (hms)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice to Eric L. Cramer: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 6/24/2022. (hms)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice to Daniel J. Walker: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 6/24/2022. (hms)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice to Robert E. Litan: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 6/24/2022. (hms)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by City of Brevard, North Carolina. All Defendants, *waivers sent on 6/9/2022, answer(s) due 8/8/2022. (Bloss, John) (Main Document 9 replaced with correct .pdf and modified *text on 6/16/2022). NEF Regenerated (ejb).
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Daniel Walker Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5615668. by City of Brevard, North Carolina. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Hunter, Robert). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jacob Polakoff Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5615664. by City of Brevard, North Carolina. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Hunter, Robert). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Robert Litan Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5615660. by City of Brevard, North Carolina. (Hunter, Robert). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Eric L. Cramer Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5615614. by City of Brevard, North Carolina. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Hunter, Robert). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick L. Berry on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Berry, Frederick)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert N. Hunter, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hunter, Robert)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to ANC Healthcare, Inc., HCA Healthcare, Inc., HCA Management Services, LP, HCA, Inc., MH Hospital Manager, LLC, MH Master Holdings, LLLP, MH Mission Hospital, LLLP, Mission Hospital, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (ejb)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5598393), filed by City of Brevard, North Carolina.(Bloss, John)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (ejb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Brevard, North Carolina v. HCA Healthcare, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANC Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By: Alison M. Agnew
Represented By: Dana C. Lumsden
Represented By: Kenneth M. Vorrasi
Represented By: Paul H. Saint-Antoine
Represented By: Anna Bryce Hobson
Represented By: Jonathan Todt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCA Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By: Abram J. Ellis
Represented By: John Robinson
Represented By: Laurel Fresquez
Represented By: Phillip T. Jackson
Represented By: Sara Y. Razi
Represented By: David Chase Hawisher
Represented By: Ann-Patton Hornthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCA Management Services, LP
Represented By: Abram J. Ellis
Represented By: John Robinson
Represented By: Laurel Fresquez
Represented By: Phillip T. Jackson
Represented By: Sara Y. Razi
Represented By: David Chase Hawisher
Represented By: Ann-Patton Hornthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCA, Inc.
Represented By: Abram J. Ellis
Represented By: John Robinson
Represented By: Laurel Fresquez
Represented By: Phillip T. Jackson
Represented By: Sara Y. Razi
Represented By: David Chase Hawisher
Represented By: Ann-Patton Hornthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MH Master Holdings, LLLP
Represented By: Abram J. Ellis
Represented By: John Robinson
Represented By: Laurel Fresquez
Represented By: Phillip T. Jackson
Represented By: Sara Y. Razi
Represented By: David Chase Hawisher
Represented By: Ann-Patton Hornthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MH Hospital Manager, LLC
Represented By: Abram J. Ellis
Represented By: John Robinson
Represented By: Laurel Fresquez
Represented By: Phillip T. Jackson
Represented By: Sara Y. Razi
Represented By: David Chase Hawisher
Represented By: Ann-Patton Hornthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MH Mission Hospital, LLLP
Represented By: Abram J. Ellis
Represented By: John Robinson
Represented By: Laurel Fresquez
Represented By: Phillip T. Jackson
Represented By: Sara Y. Razi
Represented By: David Chase Hawisher
Represented By: Ann-Patton Hornthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mission Health System, Inc.
Represented By: Alison M. Agnew
Represented By: Dana C. Lumsden
Represented By: Kenneth M. Vorrasi
Represented By: Paul H. Saint-Antoine
Represented By: Anna Bryce Hobson
Represented By: Jonathan Todt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mission Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Alison M. Agnew
Represented By: Dana C. Lumsden
Represented By: Kenneth M. Vorrasi
Represented By: Paul H. Saint-Antoine
Represented By: Anna Bryce Hobson
Represented By: Jonathan Todt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Brevard, North Carolina
Represented By: Robert N. Hunter, Jr.
Represented By: Frederick L. Berry
Represented By: John Francis Bloss, Sr.
Represented By: Daniel J Walker
Represented By: Eric Leon Cramer
Represented By: Jacob Polakoff
Represented By: Robert E. Litan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madison County
Represented By: Robert N. Hunter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Buncombe County, North Carolina
Represented By: Brendan P. Glackin
Represented By: Daniel E. Seltz
Represented By: Dean M. Harvey
Represented By: John Francis Bloss, Sr.
Represented By: Robert N. Hunter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: City of Asheville, North Carolina
Represented By: Brendan P. Glackin
Represented By: Daniel E. Seltz
Represented By: Dean M. Harvey
Represented By: John Francis Bloss, Sr.
Represented By: Robert N. Hunter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: State of NC
Represented By: Tiffany Y. Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?