Eagles Nest Outfitters, Inc. v. Taomore, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Eagles Nest Outfitters, Inc.
Defendant: Taomore, Inc., Jie Zou, WECRO, Inc. and Yubin He
Case Number: 1:2022cv00198
Filed: September 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Referring Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Change Venue by WECRO, Inc.. Responses due by 11/28/2022 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit) (Simmons, Inez). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
November 13, 2022 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM/BRIEF in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Yubin He re: #14 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Simmons, Inez)
November 13, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Yubin He. Responses due by 11/28/2022 (Simmons, Inez)
November 10, 2022 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Taomore, Inc. (Lee, Nicholas)
November 10, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Taomore, Inc., Jie Zou.(Lee, Nicholas)
November 10, 2022 SECOND Notice to Xiuyuan Hu: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 11/17/2022. (rth)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Xiuyuan Hu for Yubin He and WECRO, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 11/1/2022. (khm)
November 1, 2022 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WECRO, Inc. (Simmons, Inez)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Yubin He answer due 11/14/2022; WECRO, Inc. answer due 11/14/2022. Text of Order: ORDER: The Consent Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED, and the deadline for Defendants Yubin He and WECRO, Inc. to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is EXTENDED through and including November 14, 2022. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 11/1/2022. (kkb)
November 1, 2022 Notice to Xiuyuan Hu: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 11/8/2022. (khm)
October 31, 2022 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Yubin He, WECRO, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Consent Extension of Time) (Simmons, Inez). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
October 31, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Xiuyan Hu Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5810011. by Yubin He, WECRO, Inc.. (Simmons, Inez). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
October 31, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Inez de Ondarza Simmons, I on behalf of Yubin He, WECRO, Inc. (Simmons, Inez)
October 13, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Isabelle M. Chammas on behalf of Eagles Nest Outfitters, Inc. (Chammas, Isabelle)
September 19, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Taomore, Inc., Jie Zou, WECRO, Inc., Yubin He. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (ejb)
September 19, 2022 Filing 4 REPORT on the Filing of an action regarding patent numbers: US D666,896 S; US 9,003,579 B1; US 9,320,343 B1; US D876,206 S; and US D927,199 S; and trademark numbers: 3,839,644 and 5,391,144. (ejb)
September 19, 2022 Case Referral reassigned to Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer was assigned in error, and is now no longer assigned to the case. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (ejb)
September 16, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (ejb)
September 16, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eagles Nest Outfitters, Inc. (Schouten, Joseph)
September 16, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph A. Schouten on behalf of Eagles Nest Outfitters, Inc. (Schouten, Joseph)
September 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5746898), filed by Eagles Nest Outfitters, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - ENO Mark Reg. Cert, #3 Exhibit 2 - ENO Mark Reg. Cert., #4 Exhibit 3 - USD666896 Patent, #5 Exhibit 4 - US9003579 Patent, #6 Exhibit 5 - US9320343 Patent, #7 Exhibit 6 - USD876206 Patent, #8 Exhibit 7 - USD927199 Patent, #9 Exhibit 8 - Eno's Story, #10 Exhibit 9 - ENO website product listing, #11 Exhibit 10 - Amazon Listing, #12 Exhibit 11 - Amazon Listing, #13 Exhibit 12 - Amazon Receipts)(Schouten, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eagles Nest Outfitters, Inc. v. Taomore, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eagles Nest Outfitters, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph A. Schouten
Represented By: Isabelle M. Chammas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taomore, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas H Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jie Zou
Represented By: Nicholas H Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WECRO, Inc.
Represented By: Inez de Ondarza Simmons, I
Represented By: Xiuyuan Hu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yubin He
Represented By: Xiuyuan Hu
Represented By: Inez de Ondarza Simmons, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?