BorgWarner Thermal Systems Inc. et al v. Centurion Capital Investments, LLC et al
Plaintiff: BorgWarner Thermal Systems Inc. and BorgWarner Turbo Systems LLC
Defendant: Centurion Capital Investments, LLC and Judson N. Hollifield
Case Number: 1:2022cv00223
Filed: October 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2022 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BorgWarner Thermal Systems Inc., BorgWarner Turbo Systems LLC. Centurion Capital Investments, LLC waiver sent on 12/16/2022, answer due 2/14/2023. (Moye, John)
December 16, 2022 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Centurion Capital Investments, LLC, filed by BorgWarner Thermal Systems Inc., BorgWarner Turbo Systems LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (February 2022 Lease), #2 Exhibit B (April 2022 Lease), #3 Exhibit C (June 28, 2022 Email), #4 Exhibit D (June 30, 2022 Letter), #5 Exhibit E (July 7, 2022 Letter), #6 Exhibit F (August 25, 2022 Letter), #7 Exhibit G (August 30, 2022 Email), #8 Exhibit H (September 6, 2022 Email), #9 Exhibit I (Invoice))(Moye, John)
December 16, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Claims Against Judson N. Hollifield by BorgWarner Thermal Systems Inc., BorgWarner Turbo Systems LLC (Moye, John)
October 25, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Centurion Capital Investments, LLC, Judson N. Hollifield. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (ejb)
October 24, 2022 Case assigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (ejb)
October 24, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BorgWarner Turbo Systems LLC (Moye, John)
October 24, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BorgWarner Thermal Systems Inc. (Moye, John)
October 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Centurion Capital Investments, LLC, Judson N. Hollifield with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5800182), filed by BorgWarner Thermal Systems Inc., BorgWarner Turbo Systems LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (February 2022 Lease), #2 Exhibit B (April 2022 Lease), #3 Exhibit C (June 28, 2022 Email), #4 Exhibit D (June 30, 2022 Letter), #5 Exhibit E (July 7, 2022 Letter), #6 Exhibit F (August 25, 2022 Letter), #7 Exhibit G (August 30, 2022 Email), #8 Exhibit H (September 6, 2022 Email), #9 Exhibit I (Invoice), #10 *Civil Cover Sheet)(Moye, John) Modified *text on 10/25/2022 (ejb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BorgWarner Thermal Systems Inc. et al v. Centurion Capital Investments, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BorgWarner Thermal Systems Inc.
Represented By: John Michael Moye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BorgWarner Turbo Systems LLC
Represented By: John Michael Moye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centurion Capital Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judson N. Hollifield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?