Doe v. The University of North Carolina System et al
Plaintiff: Jacob Doe
Defendant: The University of North Carolina System, University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill, The University of North Carolina Board of Trustees, Board of Governors of The University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill, Kevin Guskiewicz, Elizabeth Hall, Jeremy Enlow, Beth Froehling, Rebecca Gibson, Jaclyn Feeney, David Elrod, Desiree Rieckenberg, The University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill and Board of Governors of The University of North Carolina
Intervenor: ACLU of North Carolina Legal Foundation, Eugene Volokh and Freedom of the Press Foundation
Case Number: 1:2023cv00041
Filed: February 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Referring Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
2 Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Civil Rights Violation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2023 Filing 31 STIPULATION Correcting the Case Caption by Jacob Doe (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ekstrand, Robert)
April 5, 2023 Filing 30 Notice of Substitution of Counsel by Kimberly D. Potter on behalf of Rebecca Gibson, Kevin Guskiewicz, David Elrod, Board of Governors of The University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill, The University of North Carolina System, Jeremy Enlow, Jaclyn Feeney, Desiree Rieckenberg, Elizabeth Hall, University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill, Beth Froehling, The University of North Carolina Board of Trustees, Attorney Kenzie M. Rakes terminated. (Potter, Kimberly)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed under Pseudonym , Responses due by 5/8/2023 Text of Order: ORDER: Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion for Leave to Proceed under Pseudonym is GRANTED, and the deadline for Defendants to respond to the Motion is EXTENDED through and including May 8, 2023. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 3/27/2023. (kkb)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint . All Defendants. Text of Order: ORDER: Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is GRANTED, and the deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is EXTENDED through and including May 8, 2023. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 3/27/2023. (kkb)
March 24, 2023 Filing 29 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed under Pseudonym by Board of Governors of The University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill, David Elrod, Jeremy Enlow, Jaclyn Feeney, Beth Froehling, Rebecca Gibson, Kevin Guskiewicz, Elizabeth Hall, Desiree Rieckenberg, The University of North Carolina Board of Trustees, The University of North Carolina System, University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill. Responses due by 4/7/2023 (Rakes, Kenzie). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
March 24, 2023 Filing 28 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Board of Governors of The University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill, David Elrod, Jeremy Enlow, Jaclyn Feeney, Beth Froehling, Rebecca Gibson, Kevin Guskiewicz, Elizabeth Hall, Desiree Rieckenberg, The University of North Carolina Board of Trustees, The University of North Carolina System, University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill. (Rakes, Kenzie). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
March 24, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy David Lindsley on behalf of Board of Governors of The University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill, The University of North Carolina Board of Trustees (Lindsley, Jeremy)
March 24, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenzie M. Rakes on behalf of Board of Governors of The University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill, The University of North Carolina Board of Trustees (Rakes, Kenzie)
March 15, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy David Lindsley on behalf of David Elrod, Jeremy Enlow, Jaclyn Feeney, Beth Froehling, Rebecca Gibson, Kevin Guskiewicz, Elizabeth Hall, Desiree Rieckenberg (Lindsley, Jeremy)
March 15, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenzie M. Rakes on behalf of David Elrod, Jeremy Enlow, Jaclyn Feeney, Beth Froehling, Rebecca Gibson, Kevin Guskiewicz, Elizabeth Hall, Desiree Rieckenberg, The University of North Carolina System, University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill (Rakes, Kenzie)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Tara Davis for Jacob Doe (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 3/9/2023. (ejb)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Stuart Bernstein for Jacob Doe (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 3/9/2023. (ejb)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Andrew Miltenberg for Jacob Doe (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 3/9/2023. (ejb)
March 9, 2023 Notice to Attorney Andrew Miltenberg: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 3/16/2023. (ejb)
March 9, 2023 Notice to Attorney Stuart Bernstein: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 3/16/2023. (ejb)
March 9, 2023 Notice to Attorney Tara Davis: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 3/16/2023. (ejb)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER denying as moot #16 Motion to Intervene Text of Order: The Motion to Intervene is DENIED as MOOT. So Ordered. Entered by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 3/3/23. (LMR)
March 1, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Russell Sigmon on behalf of Eugene Volokh (Sigmon, Mark)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER that the Plaintiff's #4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DEEMED WITHDRAWN WITHOUT PREJUDICE to renewing his request for a preliminary injunction at a later date. The Temporary Restraining Order entered 2/22/2023 is hereby DISSOLVED. The preliminary injunction hearing scheduled for 3/7/2023 is hereby CANCELLED. The Plaintiff's Motion [Doc. 4] is hereby UNSEALED and shall remain on the public docket. Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 3/1/2023. (brl)
March 1, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristi L. Graunke on behalf of ACLU of North Carolina Legal Foundation, Freedom of the Press Foundation (Graunke, Kristi)
March 1, 2023 NOTICE of Cancellation of Motion Hearing scheduled for 3/7/2023 (brl)
February 28, 2023 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support re #16 Joint MOTION to Intervene by ACLU of North Carolina Legal Foundation, Freedom of the Press Foundation, Eugene Volokh. (Graunke, Kristi)
February 28, 2023 Filing 16 Joint MOTION to Intervene by ACLU of North Carolina Legal Foundation, Eugene Volokh, Freedom of the Press Foundation. Responses due by 3/14/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Declaration of Eugene Volokh, #2 Exhibit 2- Delcaration of Kristi Graunke, #3 Exhibit 3- Declaration of Seth Stern, #4 Exhibit 4- Motion to Unseal, #5 Exhibit 5- Memorandum of Law ISO Mot. to Unseal) (Graunke, Kristi). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
February 22, 2023 Filing 15 Notice of Withdrawal of #4 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Without Prejudice; and Joint MOTION for Dissolution of #14 TRO, and MOTION to Cancel Preliminary Injunction Hearing by Jacob Doe. (Ekstrand, Robert) Modified text and converted docket entry to a pending Motion on 2/23/2023. NEF Regenerated (ejb).
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #4 Ex Parte Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order. See order for further details. Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 2/22/23. (hms) Modified text on 2/23/2023 (ejb).
February 22, 2023 NOTICE of Hearing: Show Cause Hearing set for 3/7/2023 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 100 Otis St, Asheville, NC 28801 before Chief Judge Martin Reidinger, per #14 Order. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (hms)
February 17, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy David Lindsley on behalf of The University of North Carolina System, University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill (Lindsley, Jeremy)
February 17, 2023 Case reassigned back to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger. District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr no longer assigned to the case. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(thh)
February 16, 2023 Filing 12 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (ejb)
February 16, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Stuart Bernstein, Esq. Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5946028. by Jacob Doe. (Ekstrand, Robert). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
February 16, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Marla S. Bowman on behalf of University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill (Bowman, Marla)
February 16, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Tara J. Davis, Esq. Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5946024. by Jacob Doe. (Ekstrand, Robert). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
February 16, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Andrew T. Miltenberg, Esq. Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5946018. by Jacob Doe. (Ekstrand, Robert). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
February 16, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Schedule Conflict in Hearings on motions for temporary restraining orders on February 17, 2023 by Jacob Doe re Notice of Hearing on Motion, (Ekstrand, Robert)
February 16, 2023 NOTICE of Cancellation of Motion Hearing scheduled for 2/17/2023. (ams)
February 16, 2023 Set/Reset Hearing (LOCATION ONLY) as to #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 2/17/2023 09:15 AM before District Judge Max O. Cogburn Jr. Parties will appear remotely before the Court via Teams from Courtroom 5A in Charlotte, NC. (ams)
February 15, 2023 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #4 *MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for a Preliminary Injunction (Certification of Rule 65(b)(1) Notice of Plaintiff's Motion for a TRO/PI) by Robert Christopher Ekstrand on behalf of Jacob Doe (Ekstrand, Robert) Modified text on 2/15/2023 (ejb). Modified *text on 3/6/2023 (ejb).
February 15, 2023 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 *MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for a Preliminary Injunction by Jacob Doe. (Ekstrand, Robert) Modified text and changed restriction of entry to Ex Parte as stated on Motion on 2/15/2023. NEF Regenerated on 2/15/2023 (ejb). Modified *text on 3/6/2023 (ejb).
February 15, 2023 Filing 4 *WITHDRAWN* MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for a Preliminary Injunction by Jacob Doe. Responses due by 3/1/2023 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ekstrand, Robert). Added additional motion relief sought: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, modified text and changed restriction of entry to Ex Parte as stated on Motion on 2/15/2023. NEF Regenerated. NEF Regenerated on 2/15/2023 (ejb). Modified access on 3/1/2023 per Order (Doc. No. 19) (brl). Modified text on 3/1/2023 (hms).
February 15, 2023 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed under Pseudonym by Jacob Doe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert Ekstrand, Esq.)(Ekstrand, Robert)
February 15, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed under Pseudonym by Jacob Doe. Responses due by 3/1/2023 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ekstrand, Robert)
February 15, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (VERIFIED) against All Defendants with Jury Demand, filed by Jacob Doe.(Ekstrand, Robert)
February 15, 2023 Case reassigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. Chief Judge Martin Reidinger no longer assigned to the case. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(thh)
February 15, 2023 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: #4 EX PARTE MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for a Preliminary Injunction: Motion Hearing set for 2/17/2023 09:15 AM in Courtroom 1, 100 Otis St, Asheville, NC 28801 before District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(ams) Modified text on 2/15/2023 (ejb).
February 15, 2023 Case assigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (ejb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. The University of North Carolina System et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Doe
Represented By: Robert Christopher Ekstrand
Represented By: Andrew Miltenberg
Represented By: Stuart Bernstein
Represented By: Tara Jill Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The University of North Carolina System
Represented By: Kimberly D. Potter
Represented By: Jeremy David Lindsley
Represented By: Kenzie M. Rakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The University of North Carolina Board of Trustees
Represented By: Kimberly D. Potter
Represented By: Jeremy David Lindsley
Represented By: Kenzie M. Rakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Governors of The University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Guskiewicz
Represented By: Jeremy David Lindsley
Represented By: Kenzie M. Rakes
Represented By: Kimberly D. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Hall
Represented By: Jeremy David Lindsley
Represented By: Kenzie M. Rakes
Represented By: Kimberly D. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Enlow
Represented By: Jeremy David Lindsley
Represented By: Kenzie M. Rakes
Represented By: Kimberly D. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth Froehling
Represented By: Jeremy David Lindsley
Represented By: Kimberly D. Potter
Represented By: Kenzie M. Rakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Gibson
Represented By: Kimberly D. Potter
Represented By: Jeremy David Lindsley
Represented By: Kenzie M. Rakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaclyn Feeney
Represented By: Jeremy David Lindsley
Represented By: Kenzie M. Rakes
Represented By: Kimberly D. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Elrod
Represented By: Jeremy David Lindsley
Represented By: Kenzie M. Rakes
Represented By: Kimberly D. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desiree Rieckenberg
Represented By: Jeremy David Lindsley
Represented By: Kenzie M. Rakes
Represented By: Kimberly D. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill
Represented By: Jeremy David Lindsley
Represented By: Kenzie M. Rakes
Represented By: Marla S. Bowman
Represented By: Kimberly D. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Governors of The University of North Carolina
Represented By: Jeremy David Lindsley
Represented By: Kenzie M. Rakes
Represented By: Kimberly D. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: ACLU of North Carolina Legal Foundation
Represented By: Kristi L. Graunke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Eugene Volokh
Represented By: Mark Russell Sigmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Freedom of the Press Foundation
Represented By: Kristi L. Graunke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?