Winston v. Hendley et al
Plaintiff: James Winston
Defendant: FNU Hendley and Mr. FNU Kalinowski
Case Number: 1:2023cv00312
Filed: October 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Waiving Initial Partial Filing Fee and Directing Monthly Payments be Made from Prison Account of James Winston. Directing correctional facility to transmit payments. Signed by the Clerk of Court on 12/4/2023. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (smm)
December 1, 2023 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement Filed by NC Department of Adult Correction Division of Prisons as to James Winston. (Sealed - Court) (Attachments: #1 Envelope From NC Department of Adult Correction) (cly)
November 6, 2023 Filing 5 Prisoner Admin Remedy Statement by James Winston. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner Trust Order, #2 Grievance Request to Facility-Darkest Scanning, #3 Envelope) (smm)
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Prisoner Trust Account Statement of Plaintiff. Signed by Clerk, Katherine Hord Simon. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (smm)
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS Signed by Clerk, Katherine Simon on 10/27/2023. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (cly)
October 26, 2023 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT - 1983 Application IFP (Sealed - Participants) by James Winston. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (cly)
October 26, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FNU Hendley, FNU Kalinowski, filed by James Winston. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (cly) Modified on 10/27/2023 to reflect Complaint has not been signed by the Plaintiff (cly).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winston v. Hendley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Winston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Hendley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. FNU Kalinowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?