Massey v. Hendley et al
Plaintiff: Quamaine Lee Massey and Quamaine Massey
Defendant: FNU Hendley, Kizer Jr Morgon, FNU Stancil, FNU Lowery, Robert Barker, FNU Padgett, Curtis Tate and Morgan Kizer, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2023cv00361
Filed: December 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Kenneth D Bell
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE to Plaintiff. You are hereby notified that NC Prisoner Legal Services may be available to assist you in conducting discovery. NCPLS Program Response due by 3/7/2024 (brl)
February 15, 2024 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to NC Department of Public Safety on 2/15/2024 as to defendants FNU Hendley. Waiver of Service due by 4/15/2024. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Waiver)(brl)
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that Plaintiff's Eighth Amendment excessive force claim against Hendley in his individual capacity survives initial review. IT IS FURTHERED ORDERED that all remaining claims are DISMISSED on initial review for Plaintiffs failure to state a claim for relief. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2), 1915A. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Kizer, Stancil, Lowery, and Barker are DISMISSED as Defendants in this matter. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs filing [Doc. 11] is hereby STRICKEN from the record in this matter. IT IS, THEREFORE, ORDERED that Clerk of Court shall commence the procedure for waiver of service as set forth in Local Civil Rule 4.3 for Defendant Hendley, who is alleged to be current or former employee of the North Carolina Department of Adult Corrections. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 2/14/2024. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(brl)
February 7, 2024 Filing 13 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against FNU Hendley, Morgan Kizer, Jr., FNU Stancil, FNU Lowery, Robert Barker, filed by Quamaine Massey. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (cly)
February 7, 2024 Case reassigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney. District Judge Kenneth D. Bell no longer assigned to the case. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (maf)
February 5, 2024 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Quamaine Massey. (Attachments: #1 Grievance attachments, #2 Envelope) (cly)
February 1, 2024 Filing 11 **STRICKEN PER ORDER #14 ** Letter from Quamaine Lee Massey re: Participating in the WDNC Pro Se Settlement Assistance Program. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smm) Modified on 2/16/2024 (ams).
January 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Plaintiff's #1 Complaint is dismissed without prejudice; Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days in which to amend his Complaint in accordance with the terms of this Order; Plaintiff's #7 Letter is stricken from the record in this matter; the Clerk is instructed to update the docket in this matter to reflect Defendant "Kizer Jr Morgon"s" name as Morgon Kizer, Jr.; and the Clerk is also instructed to mail Plaintiff a blank prisoner 1983 form. Amended Pleadings due by 2/28/2024. Signed by District Judge Kenneth D. Bell on 1/27/2024. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mek)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Waiving Initial Partial Filing Fee and Directing Monthly Payments be Made from Prison Account of Quamaine Lee Massey. Directing correctional facility to transmit payments. Signed by the Clerk of Court on 1/24/2024. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (smm)
January 23, 2024 Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement filed by the NC Department of Public Safety Adult & Juvenile Facilities Administration as to Quamaine Lee Massey (Sealed - Court). (Attachments: #1 Envelope From NC Department of Adult Correction) (cly)
January 11, 2024 Filing 7 *STRICKEN per #10 Order* Letter from Quamaine Lee Massey re: Administrative Remedy Exhaustion. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smm) Modified on 1/29/2024 to note letter has been stricken (mek).
January 8, 2024 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (Sealed - Court) by Quamaine Lee Massey. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (cly)
January 8, 2024 Filing 5 Prisoner Admin Remedy Statement by Quamaine Lee Massey. (Attachments: #1 Summary of Information, Evidence, Statements, #2 Grievance Documents, #3 Envelope) (cly)
December 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Prisoner Trust Account Statement of Plaintiff. Signed by Clerk, Katherine Hord Simon. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (smm)
December 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Standing Order of Instructions Regarding Pro Se Prisoner Civil Actions. Click on this link to retrieve the #Standing Order. Signed by District Judge Kenneth D. Bell on 12/27/2023. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (smm)
December 21, 2023 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (Sealed - Court) by Quamaine Lee Massey. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smm)
December 21, 2023 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT - 1983 Application IFP (Sealed - Participants) by Quamaine Lee Massey. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smm)
December 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Quamaine Lee Massey against Robert Barker, FNU Hendley, FNU Lowery, Kizer Jr Morgon, FNU Padgett, FNU Stancil, Curtis Tate. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Massey v. Hendley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quamaine Lee Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quamaine Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Hendley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kizer Jr Morgon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Stancil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Lowery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Padgett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Kizer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?