RBC Bank (USA) v. Chowdhury

Plaintiff: RBC Bank (USA)
Defendant: Johnny Islam Chowdhury
Case Number: 2:2011cv00016
Filed: April 19, 2011
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Bryson City Office
County: Macon
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 12:1819
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 12, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Johnny Islam Chowdhury against RBC Bank (USA). Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 4/12/12. (nll)
April 5, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Plaintiff shall have until April 13, 2012 in which to file a supplemental brief addressing the Defendant's request for entry of summary judgment in his favor. The Defendant may file a response to any supplemental briefing filed by the Plaintiff on or before April 20, 2012. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 4/5/12. (nll)
March 27, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties shall provide a mediator's report within seven (7) days of the entry of this Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 3/27/12. (nll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RBC Bank (USA) v. Chowdhury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RBC Bank (USA)
Represented By: Deborah E. Sperati
Represented By: Shannon Elizabeth Hoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny Islam Chowdhury
Represented By: Edward Louis Bleynat, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph A Ferikes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?