Diamond Falls Estates, LLC et al v. Nantahala Bank & Trust Company et al
Plaintiff: Diamond Falls Estates, LLC, Shirley M. Buafo and Charles K. Buafo
Defendant: Nantahala Bank & Trust Company, Steve E. Gravett, Excell Partners, LLC and John/Jane Does
Counter_claimant: Excell Partners, LLC, Steve E. Gravett and Nantahala Bank & Trust Company
Counter_defendant: Charles K. Buafo, Shirley M. Buafo and Diamond Falls Estates, LLC
Case Number: 2:2014cv00007
Filed: February 21, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Bryson City Office
County: Macon
Presiding Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 117 Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 10/22/2015. (khm)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 118 AMENDED JUDGMENT in favor of Nantahala Bank & Trust Company against Diamond Falls Estates, LLC, Charles K. Buafo, Shirley M. Buafo. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 09/29/2015. (thh)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 115 JUDGMENT in favor of Nantahala Bank & Trust Company against Diamond Falls Estates, LLC, Charles K. Buafo, Shirley M. Buafo. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 9/7/2015. (khm)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting 94 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs claims against the Gravett Defendants, and all of the counterclaims asserted by the Gravett Defendants against the Plaintiffs, are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 04/14/2015. (klb)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER that the Court previously denied Deft's 84 MOTION for Extension of Time To File Daubert Motions in the 86 Order, however, the Court will allow the parties a brief extension until 4/21/2015, to file Daubert motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 3/31/15. (ejb)
December 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER denying as moot 48 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 12/29/2014. (klb)
June 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER that all counsel for the Plaintiffs and Defendants shall appear before the Court for a hearing re 20 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan and the 28 Order amending such plan; Ordered that the time for the filing o f objections to 28 Order amending 20 Pretrial Order is extended until June 30, 2014. (Hearing set for 6/18/2014 02:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 100 Otis St, Asheville, NC 28801 before Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 6/6/14. (khm)
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting 4 Motion to Dismiss in Part; accepting 19 Memorandum and Recommendations. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 5/15/14. (khm)
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER that the Plaintiffs Disclose Citizenship of Constituent Members or partners of Diamond Falls Estates, LLC, to be filed on or before 5/16/14. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 4/23/14. (ejb)
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added John A. Moore for Charles K. Buafo, Shirley M. Buafo & Diamond Falls Estates, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 4/16/14. (ejb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diamond Falls Estates, LLC et al v. Nantahala Bank & Trust Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nantahala Bank & Trust Company
Represented By: Esther Elizabeth Manheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve E. Gravett
Represented By: Philip Scott Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Excell Partners, LLC
Represented By: Philip Scott Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diamond Falls Estates, LLC
Represented By: Zeyland G. McKinney, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley M. Buafo
Represented By: Zeyland G. McKinney, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles K. Buafo
Represented By: Zeyland G. McKinney, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Excell Partners, LLC
Represented By: Philip Scott Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Steve E. Gravett
Represented By: Philip Scott Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Nantahala Bank & Trust Company
Represented By: Esther Elizabeth Manheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Charles K. Buafo
Represented By: Zeyland G. McKinney, Jr.
Represented By: Zeyland G. McKinney, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Shirley M. Buafo
Represented By: Zeyland G. McKinney, Jr.
Represented By: Zeyland G. McKinney, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Diamond Falls Estates, LLC
Represented By: Zeyland G. McKinney, Jr.
Represented By: Zeyland G. McKinney, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?