LendingTree, LLC v. Mortech, Inc.

Plaintiff: LendingTree, LLC
Defendant: Mortech, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv00367
Filed: August 25, 2009
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Alexander
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Conrad
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 27, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 Motion to Seal. Signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 8/27/09. (gpb)
August 27, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 4 SEALED MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. (Defendant's Response due by 8/31/2009.) Signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 8/27/09. (gpb)
August 31, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Robert P. Haney, Jr for LendingTree, LLC. Signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 8/31/09. (gpb)
September 10, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: expedited discovery schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/9/09. (gpb)
September 15, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 20 Motion to Seal Transcript. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/15/09. (gpb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LendingTree, LLC v. Mortech, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LendingTree, LLC
Represented By: Mark Vasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortech, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.