Mendes v. Brown et al Featured Case

discrimination (race, disability etc) of public, laser beam technology, pro se

Plaintiff: Lynn Ellen Mendes
Defendant: Charles Brown and Charlotte Mecklenburg Public Library
Case Number: 3:2010cv00397
Filed: August 24, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Richard Voorhees
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying 5 Motion to Vacate ; denying 5 Motion for Writ of Mandamus; denying 7 Motion ; denying 8 Motion ; denying 9 Motion ; granting 12 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 8/29/2011. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(bsw)
July 15, 2011 Filing 14 USCA Case Number 11-1710 for 11 Notice of Appeal USCA Case Manager: Pamela K. Stump. (nll)
July 8, 2011 Original Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to Fourth Circuit re: 11 Notice of Appeal. (jhg)
July 8, 2011 Filing 13 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 11 Notice of Appeal (jhg)
July 5, 2011 Filing 12 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Appeal in forma pauperis by Lynn Ellen Mendes. (gpb)
July 5, 2011 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 4 Clerk's Judgment, 3 Order Dismissing Case as Frivolous by Lynn Ellen Mendes. (IFP pending) (Attachments: # 1 mailing envelope, # 2 4CCA cover letter)(gpb)
May 25, 2011 Filing 10 Miscellaneous Filing/Updated Civil Cover Sheet by Lynn Ellen Mendes. (com)
May 13, 2011 Exhibit J (Manual Filing - Patient Image Disk) by Lynn Ellen Mendes. Exhibit to 9 Motion (tmg)
May 13, 2011 Filing 9 MOTION to Add Additional Urgent Evidence and Request for Grand Jury Investigation by Lynn Ellen Mendes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits) (tmg)
April 19, 2011 Filing 8 MOTION to Add Additional Evidence by Lynn Ellen Mendes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (tmg)
February 25, 2011 Filing 7 MOTION to add additional urgent evidence by Lynn Ellen Mendes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(bsw)
January 18, 2011 Filing 6 Exhibit/Motion to add urgent addendum and evidence re: 5 Motion to Vacate, by Lynn Ellen Mendes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C, # 2 Exhibit D)(bsw)
December 7, 2010 Filing 5 MOTION to Vacate 3 Order Dismissing Case as Frivolous, MOTION for Writ of Mandamus by Lynn Ellen Mendes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(gpb). Motions referred to David Keesler.
November 19, 2010 Filing 4 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated November 19, 2010. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(gpb)
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DISMISSING CASE AS FRIVOLOUS. Signed by District Judge Richard Voorhees on 11/18/10. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(gpb)
August 24, 2010 Filing 2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lynn Ellen Mendes. (gpb)
August 24, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Charles Brown, Charlotte Mecklenburg Public Library, filed by Lynn Ellen Mendes. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet)(gpb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendes v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Ellen Mendes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte Mecklenburg Public Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?