Hall et al v. International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace & Agricultural Implement Workers of America, UAW et al
Plaintiff: |
Charles R Hall, Jr., John O'Neill, Jr., Timothy L Phillips and Charlie R Wooten |
Defendant: |
International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace & Agricultural Implement Workers of America, UAW, UAW Local 5285 and Daimler Trucks North America LLC |
Case Number: |
3:2010cv00418 |
Filed: |
August 31, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina |
Office: |
Charlotte Office |
County: |
Gaston |
Presiding Judge: |
David S. Cayer |
Presiding Judge: |
Frank D. Whitney |
Nature of Suit: |
Labor/Management Relations |
Cause of Action: |
29 U.S.C. § 185 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 17, 2013 |
Filing
103
CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 6/14/2013. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (blf)
|
May 28, 2013 |
Filing
101
ORDER granting attorney fees re 100 Affidavit. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 5/28/2013. (blf)
|
May 22, 2013 |
Filing
99
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 89 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 5/22/2013. (blf) (Main Document 99 replaced on 5/22/2013) (blf).
|
November 26, 2012 |
Filing
76
ORDER granting 71 Motion to Compel, Defendants to respond to discovery requests within 14 days of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 11/26/12. (bsw)
|
December 5, 2011 |
Filing
57
ORDER adopting 53 Memorandum and Recommendations; denying 46 Motion; denying 49 Motion to Dismiss; Plaintiff's claims against Daimler are Dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 12/5/11. (com)
|
September 21, 2011 |
Filing
56
ORDER denying as moot 13 Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Class Counsel. Signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 9/21/2011. (tmg)
|
June 21, 2011 |
Filing
47
ORDER denying as moot 22 , 24 Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 6/21/2011. (tmg)
|
November 24, 2010 |
Filing
21
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 12 Motion to Stay Case until 1/6/2011; granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 11 Amended Complaint, (Daimler Trucks North America LLC answer due 1/17/2011; International Union , United Automobile, Aerospace & Agricultural Implement Workers of America, UAW answer due 1/17/2011; UAW Local 5285 answer due 1/17/2011); denying as moot 15 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 11/23/10. (gpb)
|
September 21, 2010 |
Filing
6
ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Stephen A. Yokich for International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace & Agricultural Implement Workers of America, UAW,Stephen A. Yokich for UAW Local 5285. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 9/21/2010. (tmg)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Hall et al v. International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace & Agricultural Implement Workers of America, UAW et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Charles R Hall, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Charles H. Rabon, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: John O'Neill, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Charles H. Rabon, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Timothy L Phillips |
Represented By: |
Charles H. Rabon, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Charlie R Wooten |
Represented By: |
Charles H. Rabon, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace & Agricultural Implement Workers of America, UAW |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: UAW Local 5285 |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Daimler Trucks North America LLC |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?