Putmon v. City of Charlotte et al
Plaintiff: Janada Brianna Putmon
Defendant: City of Charlotte, Rodney Monroe and Marcus Ramon Jackson
Case Number: 3:2011cv00237
Filed: May 12, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 7/18/2013. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (eef)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/17/2013. (eef)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER directing parties to maintain exhibits. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/10/13. (ssh)
April 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 4/25/2013. (eef)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER (Bench Trial set for 6/10/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen.). Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 4/22/2013. (tmg)
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER that Plaintiffs attorney advise the court which type of trial, on the issue of damages, within 14 days. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 4/3/2013. (eef)
December 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER on Courts own motion that the trial currently set for January 14, 2012 is cancelled.. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/28/12. (tob)
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER (Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/15/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen). Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 10/12/2011. (tmg)
August 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 5 Motion to Consolidate Cases for Trial. All further pleadings to be electronically filed to: 3:11-cv-237 only. Member Case: 3:11-cv-238 to be administratively closed. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 8/24/11. (gpb)
July 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying 4 Motion to Remand and directing Plaintiffs to show cause within 10 days as to why cases 3:11-cv-237 and 3:11-cv-238 should not be consolidated. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/27/11. (gpb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Putmon v. City of Charlotte et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Charlotte
Represented By: Richard Harcourt Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney Monroe
Represented By: Richard Harcourt Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Ramon Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janada Brianna Putmon
Represented By: Matthew R. Arnold
Represented By: James Bradley Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?