Rudolph et al v. Beacon Independent Living, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mary B. Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc. and Family Forum, Inc
Defendant: Beacon Independent Living, LLC, Frank McCollum, Bruce L. Bleiman, Antoine Lassiter, Charlottetown Manor, Inc., Wind N Sea Holdings, LLC, Wesley L. Deaton and Robert N. Burris
Interested Party: Russell M. Black
Counter Defendant: Robert Rudolph and George Raad
Case Number: 3:2011cv00617
Filed: December 5, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2012 Fine as to John C. Snyder III Received: $ 180, receipt number CHD016690 (eef)
August 29, 2012 Filing 194 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Family Forum, Inc, Mary B. Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc. (Cheney, Rebecca)
August 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 193 Consent ORDER. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 8/29/12. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (com) Modified text on 8/29/2012 (com).
August 28, 2012 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER denying #192 Motion to Modify Order Granting Striking of Pleadings. The Court has reviewed the motion and construes it as a motion to reconsider its prior ruling sanctioning Defendants Bruce Bleiman and Beacon Independent Living, LLC. The motion fails to state a sufficient basis to reconsider the Court's earlier order. Furthermore, Defendants fail to provide a sufficient basis to amend the order under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 59(e). The motion is denied. Entered by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 8/28/2012. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(twm)
August 27, 2012 Minute Entry: JURY TRIAL held before District Judge Frank D. Whitney., SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE held before District Judge Frank D. Whitney. Plaintiffs attorney: Adam Horner & Rebecca Cheney. Defendants attorney: John snyder, Michael Wilson & James Blane. Court reporter: Joy Kelly. (clc)
August 27, 2012 Filing 192 MOTION to Set Aside Judge Whitney's Order of August 23, 2012 by Bruce L. Bleiman.Responses due by 9/13/2012 (Snyder, John)
August 27, 2012 Filing 191 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Antoine Lassiter by Family Forum, Inc, Mary B. Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc. (Horner, Adam)
August 27, 2012 Filing 190 STIPULATION Revised Statement of the Case by Mary B. Rudolph (Cheney, Rebecca)
August 24, 2012 Filing 189 MOTION to Quash Objection and Motion for Protective Order with Respect to Subpoena Served on Russell Black by Russell M. Black.Responses due by 9/10/2012 (Hicks, Christopher). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
August 24, 2012 Filing 188 Exhibit by Family Forum, Inc, Mary B. Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc.. Exhibit to Jury Selection, Show Cause Hearing,, Exhibits entered in Contempt Hearing; Exhibit 1: Hawaiian Employment Documents of Dr. Harr (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2: Lars Daniel Email, #2 Exhibit 3: Letter from Mr. Horner to Mr. Snyder re: Forensic Examiner)(Horner, Adam)
August 23, 2012 Minute Entry: JURY SELECTION/TRIAL held before District Judge Frank D. Whitney. Jury selected and sworn. ( Jury Trial set for 8/27/2012 08:45 AM in Courtroom 1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Frank D. Whitney.), SHOW CAUSE HEARING held before District Judge Frank D. Whitney. Plaintiffs attorney: Adam Horner & Rebecca Cheney. Defendants attorney: John Snyder, Michael Wilson & James Blane. Court reporter: Joy Kelly. (clc)
August 23, 2012 Filing 187 Exhibit List for Trial by George Raad (Blane, James) Modified to correct text on 8/24/2012 (mga).
August 23, 2012 Filing 186 Witness List by George Raad (Sealed - Attorney): (available to George Raad) (Blane, James) Modified to correct text on 8/24/2012 (mga).
August 22, 2012 Filing 185 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Wesley L. Deaton, Substitute Trustee by Family Forum, Inc, Mary B. Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc. (Horner, Adam)
August 22, 2012 Filing 184 Exhibit List by Family Forum, Inc, Mary B. Rudolph, Robert Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc..(Horner, Adam)
August 22, 2012 Filing 183 Witness List (Sealed - Participants) by Family Forum, Inc, Mary B. Rudolph, Robert Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc.(Horner, Adam)
August 21, 2012 Filing 182 Exhibit by Family Forum, Inc, Mary B. Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc.. Exhibit to #160 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, (Horner, Adam)
August 21, 2012 Filing 181 MOTION Exclude Evidence Motion to Exclude Evidence by Family Forum, Inc, Mary B. Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc..Responses due by 9/7/2012 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Horner, Adam)
August 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER rescheduling jury selection and contempt hearing as follows: ( Jury Selection reset for 8/23/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Frank D. Whitney., Show Cause Hearing reset for 8/23/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Frank D. Whitney.). Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 8/17/12. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(bsw)
August 17, 2012 Filing 179 EXHIBIT/WITNESS LIST - Miscellaneous Filing by Beacon Independent Living, LLC. Renamed Document to Filing 178 Defendant Pretrial Submissions (Snyder, John) Modified to add text on 8/21/2012 (tob).
August 16, 2012 Minute Entry: FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held before District Judge Frank D. Whitney. Plaintiffs attorney: Adam Horner. Defendants attorney: John Snyder, Michael Wilson & James Blane. Court reporter: LeShaunda Bryd. (clc)
August 16, 2012 Filing 178 EXHIBIT/Witness List (Sealed - Participants) by Beacon Independent Living, LLC(Snyder, John) Modified to add text on 8/21/2012 (tob).
August 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 177 MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS on #160 Amended MOTION Contempt of Court re #144 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, #124 Order on Motion to Compel, #128 Order filed by Mary B. Rudolph Objections to M&R due by 9/4/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 8/16/2012. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
August 16, 2012 Filing 176 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Family Forum, Inc, Mary B. Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc..Responses due by 9/4/2012 (Horner, Adam)
August 16, 2012 Filing 175 Proposed Jury Instructions by Family Forum, Inc, Mary B. Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc.(Horner, Adam)
August 16, 2012 Filing 174 EXHIBIT/WITNESS LIST - Miscellaneous Filing by Family Forum, Inc, Mary B. Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc.. JOINT PRETRIAL SUBMISSION FROM PLAINTIFFS AND COUNTERDEFENDANT GEORGE RAAD (Horner, Adam) Modified to add text on 8/21/2012 (tob).
August 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Hearing set for 8/16/2012 04:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Frank D. Whitney.. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 8/16/2012. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
August 16, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/16/2012 04:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Frank D. Whitney. (clc)
August 16, 2012 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER denying #176 Motion for TRO. Entered by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 8/16/2012. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(twm)
August 15, 2012 Minute Entry: STATUS CONFERENCE held before District Judge Frank D. Whitney. Plaintiffs attorney: Adam Horner. Defendants attorney: John Snyder & Michael Wilson. Court reporter: FTR (Magistrate Courtroom). (clc)
August 15, 2012 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER denying as moot #96 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. At the hearing on this motion, Defendants Bleiman and Beacon Indpendent Living stipulated to vacate the property no later than Friday, August 17, 2012. Because the parties have resolved this motion by stipulation and for the reasons stated in open Court following the hearing, it is denied as moot. Entered by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 8/15/2012. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(twm)
August 13, 2012 Minute Entry: MOTION HEARING held before District Judge Frank D. Whitney. Re #148 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment by Antoine Lassiter, Bruce Bleiman and, #131 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiffs, #96 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , #137 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendants' Counterclaims and Third Party Claims. Plaintiffs attorney: Adam Horner. Defendants attorney: John Snyder & John Wilson. Court reporter: Beverly Gramm (Huseby). (clc)
August 13, 2012 Filing 172 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiffs and by Wind N Sea Holdings, LLC.Responses due by 8/30/2012 (Galvin, James)
August 13, 2012 Filing 171 Notice of Withdrawal of document by Rudolph-Raad, Inc. ***Documents terminated: #170 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Wind N Sea Holdings, LLC. (Galvin, James)
August 13, 2012 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #172 Motion to Dismiss. Entered by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 8/13/2012. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(twm)
August 13, 2012 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER denying as moot #145 Motion to Strike Text of Order: Pursuant to the order issued July 18, 2012 (Doc. No. 144), this motion is denied as moot. So Ordered. Entered by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 8/13/2012.(twm)
August 10, 2012 Filing 170 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Wind N Sea Holdings, LLC (Galvin, James)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER denying #168 Motion for Reconsideration Text of Order: The Motion is denied for the reasons stated in the Court's Order entered on August 1, 2012. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on August 8, 2012. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(DSC)
August 6, 2012 Filing 169 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: #148 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment by Antoine Lassiter, Bruce Bleiman and, #139 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #96 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , #137 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendants' Counterclaims and Third Party Claims, #131 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiffs : Motion Hearing set for 8/13/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Frank D. Whitney. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(clc) (clc).
August 2, 2012 Filing 168 Motion for Reconsideration re #167 Order on Motion for Sanctions by Frank McCollum. (chh) Modified on 8/8/2012 (tob).
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 167 Memorandum and ORDER granting in part and denying in part #127 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 8/1/2012. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
July 31, 2012 Filing 166 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 8/16/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Frank D. Whitney. (eef)
July 30, 2012 Filing 165 REPLY to Response to Motion re #148 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment by Antoine Lassiter, Bruce Bleiman and by Beacon Independent Living, LLC. (Snyder, John)
July 30, 2012 Filing 164 REPLY to Response to Motion re #148 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment by Antoine Lassiter, Bruce Bleiman and by Beacon Independent Living, LLC. (Snyder, John)
July 30, 2012 Filing 163 REPLY to Response to Motion re #139 MOTION for Summary Judgment AGAINST PLAINTIFFS by Wind N Sea Holdings, LLC. (Galvin, James)
July 30, 2012 Filing 162 REPLY to Response to Motion re #131 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiffs by George Raad. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Wilson, C.)
July 30, 2012 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER denying #158 Motion to Set Aside Judgment. The Court has reviewed the motion and sealed affidavit and hereby DENIES the motion for relief from Judge Cayer's order of July 18, 2012. Furthermore, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B), the Court also REFERS the pending Motions for Contempt (Doc. No. 146 and Doc. No. 160) to the Honorable David Cayer for proposed findings of fact and recommendations on those motions. Entered by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 7/30/2012. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)
July 30, 2012 Motions # 146 & 160 referred to David S. Cayer.: #160 Amended MOTION Contempt of Court re #144 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,,,, #124 Order on Motion to Compel, #128 Order , #146 MOTION Contempt of Court re #124 Order on Motion to Compel, #128 Order (clc)
July 27, 2012 Filing 161 REPLY to Response to Motion re #127 MOTION for Sanctions by Beacon Independent Living, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Snyder, John)
July 26, 2012 Filing 160 Amended MOTION Contempt of Court re #144 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,,,, #124 Order on Motion to Compel, #128 Order by Mary B. Rudolph.Responses due by 8/13/2012 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Horner, Adam)
July 26, 2012 Filing 159 Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Affidavit of Bruce Bleiman in Support of Motion to Stay re: #158 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment (available to Bruce L. Bleiman) (Snyder, John)
July 26, 2012 Filing 158 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment by Bruce L. Bleiman.Responses due by 8/13/2012 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Bruce Bleiman)(Snyder, John)
July 24, 2012 Filing 157 RESPONSE in Opposition re #139 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #131 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiffs, #148 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment by Antoine Lassiter, Bruce Bleiman and by Mary B. Rudolph. Replies due by 8/3/2012 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit Exhibit S)(Horner, Adam)
July 24, 2012 Filing 156 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #137 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendants' Counterclaims and Third Party Claims by Bruce Bleiman and by Beacon Independent Living, LLC. Replies due by 8/3/2012 (Snyder, John)
July 24, 2012 Filing 155 RESPONSE to Motion re #148 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment by Antoine Lassiter, Bruce Bleiman and by George Raad. Replies due by 8/3/2012 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Raad Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit B cont., #4 Exhibit B cont., #5 Exhibit B cont., #6 Exhibit B cont.)(Blane, James)
July 24, 2012 Filing 154 RESPONSE to Motion re #127 MOTION for Sanctions by Frank McCollum. Replies due by 8/3/2012 (clc)
July 20, 2012 Filing 153 Exhibit A to #152 by George Raad. (Wilson, C.) Modified to correct text on 7/23/2012 (mga).
July 19, 2012 Filing 152 RESPONSE to Motion re #127 Motion for Sanctions by George Raad. Replies due by 7/30/2012 (Wilson, C.) Modified on 7/20/2012 to correct motion relationship. NEF regenerated (ssh).
July 19, 2012 Filing 151 MEMORANDUM in Support re #143 MOTION for Summary Judgment by George Raad. (Wilson, C.)
July 19, 2012 Filing 150 MEMORANDUM in Support re #131 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiffs - Second Amended to Include Certification for Compliance with Word Requirements by George Raad. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-E)(Blane, James)
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 7/18/2012. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
July 18, 2012 Filing 148 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment by Antoine Lassiter, Bruce Bleiman and by Beacon Independent Living, LLC.Responses due by 8/6/2012 (Attachments: #1 Lassiter's Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Memorandum)(Snyder, John)
July 18, 2012 Filing 147 AMENDED BRIEF IN SUPPORtT OF MOTION for Summary Judgment by Wind N Sea Holdings, LLC.Responses due by 8/6/2012 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Rudolph Dep. Excerpt)(Galvin, James) Modified to correct text on 7/19/2012 (mga).
July 18, 2012 Filing 146 MOTION Contempt of Court re #124 Order on Motion to Compel, #128 Order by Family Forum, Inc, Mary B. Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc..Responses due by 8/6/2012 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Horner, Adam)
July 18, 2012 Filing 145 MOTION to Strike by Family Forum, Inc, Mary B. Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc..Responses due by 8/6/2012 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Horner, Adam)
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER striking #140 Motion for Summary Judgment ; striking #141 Motion for Summary Judgment ; striking #142 Motion for Summary Judgment ; striking #143 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 7/18/2012. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
July 18, 2012 Filing 143 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Bruce L. Bleiman and Beacon Independent Living, LLC .Responses due by 8/6/2012 (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Signature Page Copy of Executed Signature Page of Bruce Bleiman a Part of the Affidavit of Bruce Bleiman)(Snyder, John) Modified to adddtional filer on 7/19/2012 (mga).
July 18, 2012 Filing 142 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Antoine Lassiter.Responses due by 8/6/2012 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Snyder, John) Modified to corrrect filer on 7/19/2012 (mga).
July 18, 2012 Filing 141 MOTION for Summary Judgment Antoine Lassiter and by Beacon Independent Living, LLC.Responses due by 8/6/2012 (Attachments: #1 Motion, #2 Memorandum)(Snyder, John)
July 17, 2012 Filing 140 Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment #139 by Wind N Sea Holdings, LLC.Responses due by 8/3/2012 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Bleiman Dep. Excerpt, #2 Exhibit Ex. B Rudolph Dep. Excerpt)(Galvin, James) Modified to correct text on 7/19/2012 (mga).
July 17, 2012 Filing 139 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Wind N Sea Holdings, LLC.Responses due by 8/3/2012 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Abel Affidavit and Exhibits)(Galvin, James)
July 17, 2012 Filing 138 MEMORANDUM in Support re #137 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendants' Counterclaims and Third Party Claims by Family Forum, Inc, Mary B. Rudolph, Robert Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Horner, Adam)
July 17, 2012 Filing 137 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendants' Counterclaims and Third Party Claims by Family Forum, Inc, Mary B. Rudolph, Robert Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc..Responses due by 8/3/2012 (Horner, Adam)
July 17, 2012 Filing 136 MEMORANDUM in Support re #135 MOTION to Dismiss on Defendant Wind N Sea Holdings, LLC's Counterclaims against Rudolph-Raad, Inc. and Mary B. Rudolph MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendant Wind N Sea Holdings, LLC's Counterclaims against Rudolph-Raad, Inc. and Mary B. Rudolph by Family Forum, Inc, Mary B. Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc.. (Horner, Adam)
July 17, 2012 Filing 135 MOTION to Dismiss on Defendant Wind N Sea Holdings, LLC's Counterclaims against Rudolph-Raad, Inc. and Mary B. Rudolph, MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendant Wind N Sea Holdings, LLC's Counterclaims against Rudolph-Raad, Inc. and Mary B. Rudolph by Family Forum, Inc, Mary B. Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc..Responses due by 8/3/2012 (Horner, Adam)
July 17, 2012 Filing 134 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct July 12th Order by Bruce L. Bleiman.Responses due by 8/3/2012 (Snyder, John). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
July 17, 2012 Filing 133 MEMORANDUM in Support re #131 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiffs as Amended by George Raad. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-E)(Blane, James)
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER denying #134 Motion to Amend/Correct Text of Order: The Motion is denied for the reasons stated in the Court's Order entered on July 10, 2012. Whether that Order should be stayed is left in the District Judge's discretion. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on July 17, 2012. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(DSC)
July 16, 2012 Filing 132 MEMORANDUM in Support re #131 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiffs by George Raad. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - B)(Blane, James)
July 16, 2012 Filing 131 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiffs by George Raad.Responses due by 8/2/2012 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of George Raad)(Blane, James)
July 16, 2012 Filing 130 Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Exhibit A to Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion for Sanctions re: #129 Response to Motion, (available to Family Forum, Inc, Mary B. Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc.) (Horner, Adam)
July 16, 2012 Filing 129 RESPONSE to Motion re #127 MOTION for Sanctions and Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike the Affidavit of Bruce L. Bleiman by Family Forum, Inc, Mary B. Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc.. Replies due by 7/26/2012 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Horner, Adam)
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Defendant Bleiman is ordered to pay $4,152.50 in reasonable attorneys fees to Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 7/12/2012. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
July 12, 2012 Minute Entry: DISCOVERY HEARING held via email before Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Plaintiffs attorney: Adam Horner and Rebecca Cheney by email. Defendants attorney: James Galvin and John Snyder by email. Plaintiff's objection to the notice of deposition of Kevin Byrnes is SUSTAINED. Defendant noticed deposition after expiration of discovery deadline and without first seeking leave of Court as directed in Judge Whitney's Order. SO ORDERED. (Arnold, Kristin)
July 11, 2012 Filing 127 MOTION for Sanctions by Beacon Independent Living, LLC.Responses due by 7/30/2012 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memo in Support of Motion, #2 Affidavit Affidavit in support of Motion)(Snyder, John). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
July 10, 2012 Filing 126 MOTION Contempt of Court re #118 Order on Motion to Continue Other, Order on Motion for Extension of Time, Order on Motion to Alter Judgment,,,,,, by Family Forum, Inc, Mary B. Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc..Responses due by 7/27/2012 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Horner, Adam)
July 10, 2012 Filing 125 AFFIDAVIT re #124 Order on Motion to Compel Affidavit of Attorneys' Fees by Adam L. Horner by Family Forum, Inc, Mary B. Rudolph, Robert Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc. (Horner, Adam)
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MEMORANDUM and ORDER granting in part and denying in part #119 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 7/10/2012. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
July 5, 2012 Filing 123 REPLY to Response to Motion re #119 MOTION to Compel and for Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence by Mary B. Rudolph. (Cheney, Rebecca)
July 4, 2012 Filing 122 RESPONSE in Opposition re #119 MOTION to Compel and for Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence by Bruce L. Bleiman. Replies due by 7/16/2012 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Joe Meldrich, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Bruce Bleiman, #3 Exhibit Copy of Airline ticket, #4 Exhibit Affidavit of Jodi Abel, #5 Exhibit Affidavit of Bruce Bleiman regarding his request to continue his deposition)(Snyder, John)
July 2, 2012 Filing 121 STIPULATION of Pre-Trial Scheduling Deadlines by George Raad (Blane, James)
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER re #119 MOTION to Compel. Text of Order: Response date to #119 Motion to Compel is modified to be due by July 3, 2012. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 6/29/12. (com)
June 28, 2012 Filing 120 MEMORANDUM in Support re #119 MOTION to Compel and for Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence by Family Forum, Inc, Mary B. Rudolph, Robert Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc.. (Cheney, Rebecca)
June 28, 2012 Filing 119 MOTION to Compel and for Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence by Family Forum, Inc, Mary B. Rudolph, Robert Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc..Responses due by 7/16/2012 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Cheney, Rebecca). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #88 #89 MOTION to Continue Case Management Deadlines, ( Discovery due by 7/2/2012, Motions due by 7/9/2012, Jury Selection set for 8/20/2012, Jury Trial set for 8/27/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Frank D. Whitney.); Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 8/9/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Frank D. Whitney, granting #108 Motion to Alter Judgment, in accordance with the agreement and consent of the parties.. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 6/13/2012. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
June 14, 2012 Set Hearings: Jury Selection set for 8/20/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Frank D. Whitney. (eef)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting #101 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 6/11/2012. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
June 8, 2012 Filing 116 Supplemental Memorandum by Family Forum, Inc, Mary B. Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc. as to #108 MOTION to Alter Judgment Granting a Partial Preliminary Judgment, #103 MOTION Order of Contempt , #96 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Family Forum, Inc, Mary B. Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Cheney, Rebecca)
June 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER regarding discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 6/7/12. (com)
June 7, 2012 Minute Entry: DISCOVERY HEARING held before Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Plaintiffs attorney: Adam Horner, Rebecca Cheney. Defendants attorney: James Blane, James Galvin, John Snyder. (Arnold, Kristin)
June 6, 2012 NOTICE of Cancellation of Status Conference scheduled for 6/7/12 (clc)
June 4, 2012 Filing 114 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #103 MOTION Order of Contempt by Bruce L. Bleiman. Replies due by 6/14/2012. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Bruce Bleiman, #2 Exhibit Douglas Harr E-mails to Defendant Lassiter)(Snyder, John)
June 4, 2012 Filing 113 MEMORANDUM in Support re #96 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Reply Brief in Support of Rudolph-Raads Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Family Forum, Inc, Mary B. Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc.. (Cheney, Rebecca)
June 4, 2012 Filing 112 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 6/7/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Frank D. Whitney. (eef)
May 31, 2012 Filing 111 RESPONSE in Opposition re #108 MOTION to Alter Judgment Granting a Partial Preliminary Judgment and Motion for Contempt by Family Forum, Inc, Mary B. Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc.. Replies due by 6/11/2012. (Cheney, Rebecca)
May 29, 2012 Filing 110 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #96 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Beacon Independent Living, LLC. Replies due by 6/8/2012. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit George Raad Affidavit)(Snyder, John)
May 29, 2012 Filing 109 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #108 MOTION to Alter Judgment Granting a Partial Preliminary Judgment by Beacon Independent Living, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Bruce Bleiman in support of Defendants' Motion to Modify)(Snyder, John)
May 24, 2012 Filing 108 MOTION to Alter Judgment Granting a Partial Preliminary Judgment by Beacon Independent Living, LLC.Responses due by 6/11/2012. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Services Agreement, #2 Exhibit Affidavit Kim Wood, #3 Exhibit Letters to Governmental Agencies, #4 Exhibit E-mail confirming Raad's position regarding trespass)(Snyder, John)
May 17, 2012 Filing 107 REPLY to Response to Motion re #87 MOTION for Extension of Time for trial by George Raad. (Blane, James)
May 17, 2012 Filing 106 Exhibit by Family Forum, Inc, Mary B. Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc.. Exhibit to #105 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #104 Affidavit Exhibit to Affidavit of Douglas S. Harr (Horner, Adam)
May 17, 2012 Filing 105 MEMORANDUM in Support re #103 MOTION Order of Contempt by Family Forum, Inc, Mary B. Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Horner, Adam)
May 17, 2012 Filing 104 AFFIDAVIT of Douglas S. Harr by Family Forum, Inc, Mary B. Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc. (Horner, Adam)
May 17, 2012 Filing 103 MOTION Order of Contempt by Family Forum, Inc, Mary B. Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc..Responses due by 6/4/2012. (Horner, Adam)
May 16, 2012 Filing 102 Summons Issued Electronically as to Frank McCollum. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (com)
May 15, 2012 Filing 101 MOTION to Dismiss by Edward P. Bowers, Pro Se, Receiver for Charlottetown Manor, Inc..Responses due by 6/1/2012. (eef)
May 14, 2012 Filing 100 AMENDED ANSWER to , , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against George Raad, CROSSCLAIM against George Raad, COUNTERCLAIM against George Raad by George Raad. (Wilson, C.)
May 14, 2012 Filing 99 ANSWER to #58 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, by George Raad.(Wilson, C.) (Main Document 99 replaced on 5/14/2012) (mga). NEF regenerated on 5/14/2012 (mga).
May 11, 2012 Filing 98 RESPONSE to Motion re #89 MOTION for Extension of Time for trial by Family Forum, Inc, Mary B. Rudolph, Robert Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc.. Replies due by 5/21/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cheney, Rebecca)
May 9, 2012 Filing 97 MEMORANDUM in Support re #96 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Rudolph-Raad, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Cheney, Rebecca)
May 9, 2012 Filing 96 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Rudolph-Raad, Inc..Responses due by 5/29/2012. (Cheney, Rebecca)
May 7, 2012 Filing 95 ANSWER to #58 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, by George Raad.(Wilson, C.)
May 7, 2012 Filing 94 ANSWER to #58 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, by George Raad.(Wilson, C.)
May 2, 2012 Filing 93 REPORT of Mediation Outcome of Mediation: Parties reached an Impasse. (eef)
April 30, 2012 Filing 92 STIPULATION re #47 Scheduling Order, Joint Stipulation Regarding Deadlines by Family Forum, Inc, Mary B. Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc. (Horner, Adam)
April 30, 2012 Filing 91 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Family Forum, Inc, Mary B. Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc. re #84 Answer to Counterclaim, Amended Certificate of Service (Cheney, Rebecca)
April 30, 2012 Filing 90 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Rudolph-Raad, Inc., Mary B. Rudolph, Family Forum, Inc. George Raad served on 4/20/2012, answer due 5/11/2012. (Cheney, Rebecca)
April 25, 2012 Filing 89 MOTION for Extension of Time for trial by George Raad.Responses due by 5/14/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wilson, C.). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
April 24, 2012 Filing 88 MOTION to Continue Case Management Deadlines by Beacon Independent Living, LLC.Responses due by 5/11/2012. (Snyder, John)
April 24, 2012 Filing 87 MOTION for Extension of Time for trial by George Raad.Responses due by 5/11/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Extend Deadlines)(Wilson, C.). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
April 24, 2012 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Michael Wilson on behalf of George Raad (Wilson, C.)
April 24, 2012 Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Michael Wilson on behalf of George Raad (Wilson, C.)
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER denying #87 Motion for Extension of Time Text of Order: This motion fails to comply with local rule 7.1(B), which requires the motion to indicate that counsel have conferred or attempted to confer regarding the disputed issue. The Motion for Extension of Time is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to refile a motion that complies with the local rules. So Ordered. Entered by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 4/24/2012. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)
April 19, 2012 Filing 84 Reply to Counterclaim / Third Party Claim ANSWER to #58 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, and Mary B. Rudolph's CROSSCLAIM Against George Raad by Mary B. Rudolph, Robert Rudolph. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Horner, Adam)
April 17, 2012 Filing 83 STIPULATION re #47 Scheduling Order, Joint Stipulation Regarding Discovery Deadline by Family Forum, Inc, Mary B. Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc. (Horner, Adam)
April 11, 2012 Filing 82 Notice of Substitution of Counsel by James Patrick Galvin on behalf of Wind N Sea Holdings, LLC, Attorney R. Keith Johnson terminated. (Galvin, James)
April 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 PROTECTIVE ORDER, granting #78 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 4/10/2012. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg)
April 11, 2012 Filing 80 Miscellaneous Filing by Family Forum, Inc, Mary B. Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc.. re: #79 Response to Order to Show Cause Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendants' Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause (Horner, Adam)
April 10, 2012 Filing 79 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. (Snyder, John)
April 10, 2012 Filing 78 MOTION for Protective Order by Family Forum, Inc, Mary B. Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc..Responses due by 4/27/2012. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cheney, Rebecca). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting #76 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #58 Counterclaim. Mary B. Rudolph answer due 4/9/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 4/9/12. (com) Modified text on 4/10/2012 (com).
April 6, 2012 Filing 76 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Counterclaim by Mary B. Rudolph.Responses due by 4/23/2012. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Horner, Adam). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
April 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER denying #63 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying #72 Motion for TRO. The Beacon Defendants shall comply with the Show Cause order nolater than 4/10/12. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 4/5/12. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(com)
April 3, 2012 Filing 74 AFFIDAVIT re #72 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Family Forum, Inc, Mary B. Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc. (Horner, Adam)
April 3, 2012 Filing 73 MEMORANDUM in Support re #72 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Family Forum, Inc, Mary B. Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc.. (Horner, Adam)
April 3, 2012 Filing 72 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Family Forum, Inc, Mary B. Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc..Responses due by 4/20/2012. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Horner, Adam)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting #70 Motion to Dismiss as to Defendant Frank McCollum without Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 3/29/12. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(com)
March 29, 2012 Filing 70 MOTION to Dismiss Frank McCollum Without Prejudice by Family Forum, Inc, Mary B. Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc..Responses due by 4/16/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Horner, Adam)
March 29, 2012 Minute Entry: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held before Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Plaintiffs attorney: Rebecca K. Cheney. Defendants attorney: John C. Snyder, III. (Arnold, Kristin)
March 27, 2012 Filing 69 Notice of Substitution of Counsel by John C. Snyder, III on behalf of Antoine Lassiter, Bruce L. Bleiman, Beacon Independent Living, LLC, (Snyder, John)
March 26, 2012 Filing 68 Notification of Address re: #56 Order by Frank McCollum (tmg)
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER sua sponte continuing trial, ( Jury Trial set for 8/8/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Frank D. Whitney.)( Pro Se deft McCollum served by mail at address provided in order). Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 3/22/12. (ssh)
March 21, 2012 Filing 66 AFFIDAVIT re #65 Affidavit with Exhibits by Family Forum, Inc, Mary B. Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Horner, Adam)
March 20, 2012 Filing 65 AFFIDAVIT of Kimberly Wood by Family Forum, Inc, Mary B. Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc. (Horner, Adam)
March 20, 2012 Filing 64 MEMORANDUM in Support re #63 Second MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Family Forum, Inc, Mary B. Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Horner, Adam)
March 20, 2012 Filing 63 Second MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Family Forum, Inc, Mary B. Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc..Responses due by 4/6/2012. (Horner, Adam)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #61 Motion to Dismiss defendant Robert Burris Without Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 3/20/2012. (tmg)
March 19, 2012 Filing 61 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant ROBERT BURRIS Without Prejudice by Family Forum, Inc, Mary B. Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc..Responses due by 4/5/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cheney, Rebecca)
March 16, 2012 Filing 60 Summons Issued Electronically as to George Raad. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (tmg)
March 16, 2012 Filing 59 Summons Issued Electronically as to Robert Rudolph. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (tmg)
March 16, 2012 Filing 58 AMENDED ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint, #42 Answer to Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Mary B. Rudolph, Robert Rudolph, George Raad by Bruce L. Bleiman, Beacon Independent Living, LLC. (Davies, Joseph)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #50 Motion for Leave to Amend Answer, Defendants shall file an Amended Answer and Counterclaims on or before 3/21/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 3/14/2012. (tmg)
March 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #53 , #55 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Peter Crane Anderson and William R. Terpening terminated. The Court Directs Mr. McCollum to file with the Clerk his address of record within 3 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 3/13/2012. (tmg)
March 13, 2012 Filing 55 Supplemental MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Frank McCollum. (Terpening, William). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
March 12, 2012 Filing 54 REPLY to Response to Motion re #50 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaims MOTION for Joinder of Additional Parties by Beacon Independent Living, LLC, Bruce L. Bleiman. (Davies, Joseph)
March 8, 2012 Filing 53 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Frank McCollum. (Anderson, Peter). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
March 7, 2012 Minute Entry: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held before Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Plaintiffs attorney: Rebecca K. Cheney. Defendants attorney: Joseph A. Davies. (Arnold, Kristin)
March 5, 2012 Filing 52 RESPONSE in Opposition re #50 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaims MOTION for Joinder of Additional Parties by Family Forum, Inc, Mary B. Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc.. (Horner, Adam)
February 21, 2012 Filing 51 ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint by Frank McCollum.(Anderson, Peter)
February 15, 2012 Filing 50 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaims, MOTION for Joinder of Additional Parties by Beacon Independent Living, LLC, Bruce L. Bleiman.Responses due by 3/5/2012. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Answer and Counterclaims, #2 Proposed Order)(Davies, Joseph). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
February 8, 2012 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER denying #46 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. The Court has reviewed the verified complaint and finds it sufficiently alleges a RICO claim with particularity and specificity. Because Plaintiffs have sufficiently alleged a RICO claim, this Court has subject matter jurisdiction over this action involving a federal question. The motion is denied. Entered by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 2/8/2012.
February 2, 2012 Filing 49 Reply to Counterclaim ANSWER to #37 Answer to Complaint, Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,,,,,, by Rudolph-Raad, Inc..(Cheney, Rebecca)
February 2, 2012 Filing 48 Ms. Rudolph's Reply to Counterclaim ANSWER to #37 Answer to Complaint, Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,,,,,, by Mary B. Rudolph.(Cheney, Rebecca)
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 4/17/2012. Motions due by 5/1/2012. Mediation deadline set for 4/24/2012. Jury Trial set for 7/9/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Frank D. Whitney.. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 2/1/12. (chh)
January 24, 2012 Filing 46 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (12(b)(1)) by Frank McCollum.Responses due by 2/10/2012. (Terpening, William)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #22 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 1/23/12. (com)
January 20, 2012 Minute Entry: MOTION HEARING held before District Judge Frank D. Whitney. Re #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Order to issue. Plaintiffs attorney: Adam Horner, Rebecca Cheney. Defendants attorney: Will Terpening, J. Daniel Bishop. Court reporter: Joy Kelly. (chh)
January 19, 2012 Minute Entry: MOTION HEARING held before District Judge Frank D. Whitney. Re #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion Hearing set for 1/20/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Frank D. Whitney. Plaintiffs attorney: Adam Horner & RebeccaCheney. Defendants attorney: J. Daniel Bishop & William Terpening. Court reporter: Joy Kelly. (clc)
January 17, 2012 Filing 44 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (NOTICE THAT MCCOLLUM JOINS IN PI OPPOSITION BRIEF OF BLEIMAN, LASSITER, AND BEACON (Doc. 39), AND SUBMISSION OF ADDITIONAL EVIDENCE SUPPLEMENTING SAME) by Frank McCollum. Replies due by 1/27/2012. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Terpening, William)
January 17, 2012 Filing 43 REPLY to Response to Motion re #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction PLAINTIFFS REPLY BRIEF by Family Forum, Inc, Mary B. Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Horner, Adam)
January 17, 2012 Filing 42 ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint by Beacon Independent Living, LLC, Bruce L. Bleiman.(Bishop, J.)
January 16, 2012 Filing 41 DECLARATION re #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #39 Response in Opposition to Motion of Antoine Lassiter (with bookmarked exhibits) filed by Beacon Independent Living, LLC, Bruce L. Bleiman, Antoine Lassiter (Bishop, J.)
January 13, 2012 Filing 40 AFFIDAVIT re #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction of Jennifer R Coleman (affiant) by Beacon Independent Living, LLC, Bruce L. Bleiman, Antoine Lassiter (Bishop, J.)
January 13, 2012 Filing 39 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with bookmarked exhibits by Beacon Independent Living, LLC, Bruce L. Bleiman, Antoine Lassiter. Replies due by 1/23/2012. (Bishop, J.)
January 13, 2012 Filing 38 NOTICE by Family Forum, Inc, Mary B. Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc. re #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS PARTIAL WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Horner, Adam)
January 13, 2012 Filing 37 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #19 Amended Complaint , ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #19 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Mary B. Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc. by Wind N Sea Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Promissory Note, #2 Note Modification Agreement, #3 Bill of Sale and Assignment of Loan Documents, #4 Assignment of Security Instruments, #5 Notification to Sale Letter, #6 Guaranty Agreement)(Johnson, R.) (Main Document 37 replaced on 1/13/2012) (tmg).
January 12, 2012 Minute Entry: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held before District Judge Frank D. Whitney. Plaintiffs attorney: Adam Horner. Defendants attorney: R. Keith Johnson. (clc)
January 12, 2012 Filing 36 RESPONSE re #32 Order, Set Motion and M&R Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions,,, Answers to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories by Wind N Sea Holdings, LLC. (Johnson, R.)
January 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to amd complaint. Beacon Independent Living, LLC answer due 1/17/2012; Bruce L. Bleiman answer due 1/17/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 1/6/12. (bsw)
January 5, 2012 Minute Entry: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held before District Judge Frank D. Whitney. Plaintiffs attorney: Becky Cheney. Defendants attorney: J. Daniel Bishop, William Terpening & R. Keith Johnson. (clc)
January 5, 2012 Filing 34 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #19 Amended Complaint by Beacon Independent Living, LLC, Bruce L. Bleiman. (Bishop, J.). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
January 5, 2012 Filing 33 ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint by Antoine Lassiter.(Bishop, J.)
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #23 #30 motions, granting in part and denying in part #25 motion, denying as moot #26 motion. Motion for Preliminary Injunction (doc. 22)is set for Thursday, January 19, 2012 at 10:30am. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 1/5/12. (chh)
January 5, 2012 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 1/19/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Frank D. Whitney. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(chh)
January 3, 2012 Filing 31 ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint by Wesley L. Deaton.(Deaton, Wesley)
December 29, 2011 Filing 30 MOTION for Hearing re #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #23 MOTION for Hearing re #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Amended by Mary B. Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc..Responses due by 1/17/2012. (Cheney, Rebecca)
December 28, 2011 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT re #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Mary B. Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Cheney, Rebecca)
December 28, 2011 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT re #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Mary B. Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Cheney, Rebecca)
December 28, 2011 Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT re #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Mary B. Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Cheney, Rebecca)
December 28, 2011 Filing 26 MOTION for Hearing re #25 MOTION for Discovery by Mary B. Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc..Responses due by 1/17/2012. (Cheney, Rebecca)
December 28, 2011 Filing 25 MOTION for Discovery by Mary B. Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc..Responses due by 1/17/2012. (Cheney, Rebecca). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
December 28, 2011 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Support re #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #23 MOTION for Hearing re #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Mary B. Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc.. (Cheney, Rebecca)
December 28, 2011 Filing 23 MOTION for Hearing re #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Mary B. Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc..Responses due by 1/17/2012. (Cheney, Rebecca) (Main Document 23 replaced on 12/29/2011) (mga). NEF regenerated on 12/29/2011 (mga).
December 28, 2011 Filing 22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Mary B. Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc..Responses due by 1/17/2012. (Cheney, Rebecca)
December 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Amd Complaint. Frank McCollum answer due 1/24/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Cayer on 12/23/11. (bsw) Modified on 12/27/2011 to reflect correct judge (bsw).
December 22, 2011 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #19 Amended Complaint by Frank McCollum. (Terpening, William). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
December 20, 2011 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT Verified with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Family Forum, Inc, Rudolph-Raad, Inc., Mary B. Rudolph. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Cheney, Rebecca)
December 16, 2011 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Family Forum, Inc, Rudolph-Raad, Inc., Mary B. Rudolph. Bruce L. Bleiman served on 12/13/2011, answer due 1/3/2012. (Cheney, Rebecca)
December 16, 2011 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Family Forum, Inc, Rudolph-Raad, Inc., Mary B. Rudolph. Antoine Lassiter served on 12/10/2011, answer due 1/3/2012. (Cheney, Rebecca)
December 14, 2011 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Family Forum, Inc (Cheney, Rebecca)
December 14, 2011 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rudolph-Raad, Inc. (Cheney, Rebecca)
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #4 Motion to Expedite Discovery; denying #5 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 12/13/11. (gpb)
December 12, 2011 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Crane Anderson on behalf of Frank McCollum (Anderson, Peter)
December 12, 2011 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by William R. Terpening on behalf of Frank McCollum (Terpening, William)
December 12, 2011 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Magistrate Judge David Keesler no longer assigned to the case. Motions referred to David S. Cayer: #4 MOTION to Expedite Discovery (EMERGENCY), #5 MOTION for Hearing re #4 MOTION to Expedite Discovery (EMERGENCY) to Shorten the Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(com)
December 12, 2011 Motion referred to David Keesler: #4 MOTION to Expedite Discovery (EMERGENCY), #5 MOTION for Hearing re #4 MOTION to Expedite Discovery (EMERGENCY) to Shorten the Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery (com)
December 9, 2011 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Family Forum, Inc, Rudolph-Raad, Inc., Mary B. Rudolph. Wesley L. Deaton served on 12/8/2011, answer due 12/29/2011. (Cheney, Rebecca)
December 9, 2011 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Family Forum, Inc, Rudolph-Raad, Inc., Mary B. Rudolph. Charlottetown Manor, Inc. served on 12/8/2011, answer due 12/29/2011. (Cheney, Rebecca)
December 9, 2011 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Family Forum, Inc, Rudolph-Raad, Inc., Mary B. Rudolph. Beacon Independent Living, LLC served on 12/8/2011, answer due 12/29/2011. (Cheney, Rebecca)
December 9, 2011 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Family Forum, Inc, Rudolph-Raad, Inc., Mary B. Rudolph. Wind N Sea Holdings, LLC served on 12/8/2011, answer due 12/29/2011. (Cheney, Rebecca)
December 9, 2011 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Family Forum, Inc, Rudolph-Raad, Inc., Mary B. Rudolph. Frank McCollum served on 12/8/2011, answer due 12/29/2011. (Cheney, Rebecca)
December 9, 2011 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Family Forum, Inc, Rudolph-Raad, Inc., Mary B. Rudolph. Robert N. Burris served on 12/8/2011, answer due 12/29/2011. (Cheney, Rebecca)
December 8, 2011 Filing 5 MOTION for Hearing re #4 MOTION to Expedite Discovery (EMERGENCY) to Shorten the Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery by Family Forum, Inc, Mary B. Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc..Responses due by 12/27/2011. (Horner, Adam)
December 8, 2011 Filing 4 MOTION to Expedite Discovery (EMERGENCY) by Family Forum, Inc, Mary B. Rudolph, Rudolph-Raad, Inc..Responses due by 12/27/2011. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Horner, Adam)
December 6, 2011 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Karen Cheney on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cheney, Rebecca)
December 6, 2011 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (tmg)
December 6, 2011 Case assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and referred to Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (tmg)
December 6, 2011 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (tmg)
December 5, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0419-1531466), filed by FAMILY FORUM, INC., RUDOLPH-RAAD, INC., Mary B Rudolph. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Horner, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rudolph et al v. Beacon Independent Living, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary B. Rudolph
Represented By: Rebecca Karen Cheney
Represented By: Adam Louis Horner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rudolph-Raad, Inc.
Represented By: James Patrick Galvin
Represented By: Rebecca Karen Cheney
Represented By: Adam Louis Horner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Family Forum, Inc
Represented By: Rebecca Karen Cheney
Represented By: Adam Louis Horner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beacon Independent Living, LLC
Represented By: J. Daniel Bishop
Represented By: Joseph Alan Davies
Represented By: John C. Snyder, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank McCollum
Represented By: Peter Crane Anderson
Represented By: William R. Terpening
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce L. Bleiman
Represented By: J. Daniel Bishop
Represented By: Joseph Alan Davies
Represented By: John C. Snyder, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antoine Lassiter
Represented By: J. Daniel Bishop
Represented By: John C. Snyder, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlottetown Manor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wind N Sea Holdings, LLC
Represented By: R. Keith Johnson
Represented By: James Patrick Galvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesley L. Deaton
Represented By: Wesley Lane Deaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert N. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Russell M. Black
Represented By: Christopher A. Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Robert Rudolph
Represented By: Adam Louis Horner
Represented By: Rebecca Karen Cheney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: George Raad
Represented By: C. Michael Wilson
Represented By: James L. Blane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?