Econo-Lube N'Tune, Inc. v. Orange Racing, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Econo-Lube N'Tune, Inc.
Defendant: Orange Racing, LLC and Robert Tollenaar
Case Number: 3:2012cv00449
Filed: July 23, 2012
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Max O. Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Franchise
Cause of Action: Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 1, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 14 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, the Voluntary Dismissal is deemed to be a Motion to Dismiss under Rule 41(a)(2) and is GRANTED, and this action is DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 09/01/2015. (jlk)
September 10, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 9/10/2012. (eef)
August 16, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Motion to Continue hearing on 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Hearing is RECALENDARED for September 10, 2012, at 2 p.m. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 8/16/2012. (eef) Modified on 8/16/2012 (eef).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Econo-Lube N'Tune, Inc. v. Orange Racing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Econo-Lube N'Tune, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Anthony Romanzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orange Racing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Tollenaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?